EP3724566 - VACUUM ADIABATIC BODY AND REFRIGERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.07.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 128, Yeoui-daero, Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2020/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAM, Hyeunsik IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 51, Gasan digital 1-ro Geumcheon-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Bongjin IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 51, Gasan digital 1-ro Geumcheon-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | [2020/43] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2020/43] | Application number, filing date | 18889271.5 | 11.12.2018 | [2020/43] | WO2018KR15713 | Priority number, date | KR20170171616 | 13.12.2017 Original published format: KR 20170171616 | [2020/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019117601 | Date: | 20.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3724566 | Date: | 21.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 20.06.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F25D23/06, F16L59/02, F25D21/04, F25D23/02, F16L59/065, F25D23/08 | [2021/35] | CPC: |
F25D23/082 (EP,CN);
F25D11/00 (CN,RU);
F25D23/065 (CN,KR,US);
F25D23/028 (CN,KR,US);
F16L59/02 (CN,KR);
F16L59/065 (CN,KR,US);
F25D21/04 (CN,US);
F25D23/06 (RU);
F25D23/087 (US);
E05Y2800/12 (US);
F25D2201/14 (EP,CN,KR,US);
F25D2323/021 (CN,US);
F25D2323/024 (CN,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/43] | F25D23/06, F16L59/02, F25D21/04, F25D23/02, F16L59/065 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/43] | Title | German: | ADIABATISCHER VAKUUMKÖRPER UND KÜHLSCHRANK | [2020/43] | English: | VACUUM ADIABATIC BODY AND REFRIGERATOR | [2020/43] | French: | CORPS ADIABATIQUE SOUS VIDE ET RÉFRIGÉRATEUR | [2020/43] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.2020 | Search fee paid | 15.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/43] | 25.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]US2002041134 (WOLF ULRICH [DE], et al); | [XAI]US2002100250 (HIRATH JURGEN [DE], et al); | [Y]US2007133192 (ALESSANDRO CREMASCHI [IT]); | [A]WO2017023095 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) | International search | [A]JP2008089244 (TOSHIBA CORP, et al); | [Y]US2009284116 (GOERZ ALEXANDER [DE], et al); | [Y]JP2013002655 (TOSHIBA CORP, et al); | [Y]WO2013164176 (MIELE & CIE [DE], et al); | [YA]KR20170016187 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) | by applicant | US2040226956 | US2518673 | US2002041134 | KR100343719B | US2002100250 | US2007133192 | KR20150012712 | WO2017023095 | KR20170016187 |