EP3726699 - STARTING POWER SUPPLY DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MOBILE CHARGING VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.10.2021 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.11.2021 [2021/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIO (Anhui) Holding Co., Ltd. Susong Road West, Shenzhen Road North Economic and Technological Development Zone Hefei City, Anhui Province / CN | [2021/19] |
Former [2021/14] | For all designated states Nio Nextev Limited 30th Floor, Jardine House One Connaught Place Central Hong Kong / CN | ||
Former [2020/43] | For all designated states Nio Co., Ltd. 20 Building No. 56 Antuo Road Anting Town Jiading Shanghai 201804 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAN, Yinhua Building 20, No. 56 Antuo Road Anting Town Jiading Shanghai 201804 / CN | 02 /
WU, Guangtao Building 20, No. 56 Antuo Road Anting Town Jiading Shanghai 201804 / CN | [2020/43] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/43] | Gille Hrabal Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 18889379.6 | 15.08.2018 | [2020/43] | WO2018CN100675 | Priority number, date | CN201711342316 | 14.12.2017 Original published format: CN201711342316 | [2020/43] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019114304 | Date: | 20.06.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3726699 | Date: | 21.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 20.06.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H02J9/06, H02J7/00, H02J7/34 | [2021/21] | CPC: |
H02J7/0068 (EP);
H02J9/061 (EP,CN);
H02J7/34 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/43] | H02J9/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/43] | Title | German: | STARTLEISTUNGSVERSORGUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG MIT MOBILER AUFLADUNG | [2020/43] | English: | STARTING POWER SUPPLY DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MOBILE CHARGING VEHICLE | [2020/43] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ D'ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE DE DÉMARRAGE POUR VÉHICULE DE CHARGE MOBILE | [2020/43] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2020 | Translation filed | 10.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2020 | Search fee paid | 10.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/43] | 19.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2017158082 (TAHARA MASAHIKO [JP]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0025] - [0030] - [0032] - [0045] - [0047] - [0077] *; | [A]US5316868 (DOUGHERTY THOMAS J [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 22 * * column 2, line 41 - column 4, line 28 *; | [A]US2002195995 (COOK NORMAN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0015] - [0023] *; | [A]CN103036299 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |