EP3723488 - THERAPEUTIC BACTERIOCINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bactoclear Holdings Pte Ltd. 1 Robinson Road 17-00 AlA Tower Singapore 048542 / SG | For all designated states Ambady, Anisha Abhiram, 155, D. Krishnappa Layout N. Nagenahalli Kothanur Post Karnataka Bengaluru 560077 / IN | [2020/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
APPAIAH, Chemira Biddappa No. A3, Murthy Elegance, Vyalikaval HBCS Nagavara Karnataka, Bengaluru 560045 / IN | 02 /
BALASUBRAMANIAN, Deepak G1 Gururaghav Apts, Rajarajeshwari Nagar Rajakilpakam, Tamil Nadu Chennai 600073 / IN | 03 /
PAUL, Vivek Daniel B107, Sobha Jade, Jakkur Karnataka, Bengaluru 560064 / IN | 04 /
SARAVANAN, R. Sanjeev No. 77, Saravana Nivas, 3rd Cross Ganesha Temple Street Dinnur, R.T.Nagar Karnataka, Bengaluru 560032 / IN | 05 /
SHARMA, Umender Kumar Flat No 203, Chalet, 2/2, 13th cross Malleshwaram Karnataka, Bengaluru 560003 / IN | 06 /
AMBADY, Anisha Abhiram, No. 155, D. Krishnappa Layout N. Nagenahalli, Kothanur Post Karnataka, Bengaluru 560077 / IN | [2020/43] | Representative(s) | Geling, Andrea ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | [2020/43] | Application number, filing date | 18889717.7 | 13.12.2018 | [2020/43] | WO2018IN50837 | Priority number, date | IN201741045069 | 14.12.2017 Original published format: IN201741045069 | [2020/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019116392 | Date: | 20.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3723488 | Date: | 21.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.06.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/16, A61K38/43, A61K38/50, A61K39/085, A61K39/108, C07K14/195, C07K14/21, C07K14/245 | [2021/42] | CPC: |
A61K38/43 (EP,US);
A01N63/10 (US);
A01N63/50 (EP,US);
A61K38/164 (EP);
C07K14/195 (EP);
C07K14/21 (EP,US);
C07K14/24 (EP);
C07K14/245 (EP);
C07K14/26 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K38/43, A61K2300/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/43] | A01N63/02, A61K38/16, A61K38/43, A61K38/50, A61K39/085, A61K39/108, C07K14/195, C07K14/21, C07K14/245 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/43] | Title | German: | THERAPEUTISCHE BAKTERIOZINE | [2020/43] | English: | THERAPEUTIC BACTERIOCINS | [2020/43] | French: | BACTÉRIOCINES THÉRAPEUTIQUES | [2020/43] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2020 | Search fee paid | 24.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/43] | 14.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2020 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   01.03.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]US2021163546 (AMBADY ANISHA [IN], et al) | International search | [A]US7700729 (SCHOLL DEAN M [US], et al); | [A]US2013156737 (MOUGOUS JOSEPH [US], et al); | [XY]WO2016046218 (UNIV GLASGOW [GB]); | by applicant | US4458066 | US4683202 | EP0246864 | US4935349 | US5017478 | US5414085 | US5426039 | US6506602 | US6518065 | US6521453 | US6579678 | WO2007130655 | WO2016046218 | US2021163546 |