EP3728137 - POLYMERIC FLUOROPHORES, COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING THE SAME, AND METHODS OF PREPARING AND USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.09.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states North Carolina State University 1021 Main Campus Drive 2nd Floor Raleigh, North Carolina 27606 / US | [2020/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINDSEY, Jonathan S. 1236 Canterbury Road Raleigh, North Carolina 27608 / US | 02 /
HU, Gongfang 2533 Brisbane Woods Way Cary, North Carolina 27518 / US | 03 /
LIU, Rui 1007 Village Greenway, Apartment F Cary, North Carolina 27511 / US | [2020/44] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/44] | Robin, Yann Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | Application number, filing date | 18890479.1 | 18.12.2018 | [2020/44] | WO2018US66195 | Priority number, date | US201762609494P | 22.12.2017 Original published format: US 201762609494 P | US201862714541P | 03.08.2018 Original published format: US 201862714541 P | [2020/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019126144 | Date: | 27.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3728137 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.06.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/56, C07D311/82, C09B11/24 | [2020/44] | CPC: |
C07D487/22 (EP);
C09B69/108 (EP,US);
A61K49/0032 (US);
A61K49/0054 (US);
C08F293/005 (US);
C08L33/08 (US);
C09B67/0097 (EP);
C09B69/105 (EP);
C08F2438/03 (US);
C08L2207/53 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] | Title | German: | POLYMERE FLUOROPHORE, DIESE ENTHALTENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG | [2020/44] | English: | POLYMERIC FLUOROPHORES, COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING THE SAME, AND METHODS OF PREPARING AND USING THE SAME | [2020/44] | French: | FLUOROPHORES POLYMÈRES, COMPOSITIONS LES COMPRENANT, ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉPARATION ET D'UTILISATION | [2020/44] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2020 | Search fee paid | 18.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 07.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2010054266 (UNIV WASHINGTON [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0380]; figure 1; examples 9,10 *; | [XI]WO2010077678 (UNIV WASHINGTON [US], et al) [X] 1-7,10-15 * the whole document * [I] 8,9; | [X]WO2012039741 (UNIV TEXAS [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 4 - page 6; figures 1, 2, 4, 9 *; | [X]US2016089455 (HYEON TAEGHWAN [KR], et al) [X] 1-15* figures 1,5; examples 1,13,14,19,21 *; | [X]WO2016114634 (UNIV SEOUL NAT R & DB FOUND [KR]) [X] 1-15 * figures 1-7, 29-31, 33 * | International search | [A]US2002032252 (ISHIZUKA TAKAHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-3, 27-29* ; entire document *; | [X]US2007105990 (MAKINO NAONORI [JP], et al) [X] 27-29 * ; Title, Abstract, para[0043], para[0143] *; | [X]US2008095699 (ZHENG SHIYING [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * ; Title, Abstract, para[0021] *; | [A]US2010210742 (IYODA TOMOKAZU [JP], et al) [A] 1-3, 27-29 * ; entire document *; | [A]US2013280751 (PAPKOVSKY DMITRI [IE], et al) [A] 1-3, 27-29 * ; entire document *; | [A] - MIKSA B., "Fluorescent Dyes Used in Polymer Carriers as Imaging Agents in Anticancer Therapy", Medicinal chemistry, (20161115), vol. 6, no. 10, pages 611 - 639, XP055620069 [A] 1-3, 27-29 * ; entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4172/2161-0444.1000406 |