EP3728329 - COVALENT MULTI-SPECIFIC ANTIBODIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2020 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chimagen Biosciences, Ltd. No. 1, 9th Floor, Building 1 No. 5, Keyuan South Road, High-tech Zone Chengdu, Sichuan 610041 / CN | [2020/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHOU, Zhenhao No. 1, 9th Floor, Building 1 No. 5, Keyuan South Road, High-tech Zone Chengdu, sichuan 610041 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Jie No. 1, 9th Floor, Building 1 No. 5, Keyuan South Road, High-tech Zone Chengdu, sichuan 610041 / CN | [2020/44] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/44] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 18891160.6 | 20.12.2018 | [2020/44] | WO2018CN122321 | Priority number, date | CN201711415979 | 22.12.2017 Original published format: CN201711415979 | [2020/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019120245 | Date: | 27.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3728329 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 27.06.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/46, A61P35/00, A61K39/00, C07K16/28 | [2021/36] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07K16/468 (EP,CN,US);
C07K16/2803 (EP,US);
C07K16/2809 (EP,US);
C07K16/2815 (EP);
A61K2039/505 (EP,CN,US);
A61K2039/545 (EP);
C07K2317/31 (EP,CN,US);
C07K2317/526 (EP);
C07K2317/55 (EP);
C07K2317/56 (EP,CN,US);
C07K2317/66 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/44] | C07K16/46 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] | Title | German: | KOVALENTE MULTISPEZIFISCHE ANTIKÖRPER | [2020/44] | English: | COVALENT MULTI-SPECIFIC ANTIBODIES | [2020/44] | French: | ANTICORPS MULTI-SPÉCIFIQUES COVALENTS | [2020/44] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2020 | Search fee paid | 22.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 02.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2008157379 (MACROGENICS INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2010080538 (MACROGENICS INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2015184203 (MACROGENICS INC [US]) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XY] - FA YANG ET AL, "Bispecific Antibodies as a Development Platform for New Concepts and Treatment Strategies", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR SCIENCES, (20161228), vol. 18, no. 1, doi:10.3390/ijms18010048, page 48, XP055396346 [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 2-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/ijms18010048 | [Y] - T. IGAWA ET AL, "VH/VL interface engineering to promote selective expression and inhibit conformational isomerization of thrombopoietin receptor agonist single-chain diabody", PROTEIN ENGINEERING DESIGN AND SELECTION, (20100624), vol. 23, no. 8, doi:10.1093/protein/gzq034, ISSN 1741-0126, pages 667 - 677, XP055034025 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/protein/gzq034 | [Y] - HONGYAN LIU ET AL, "Fc Engineering for Developing Therapeutic Bispecific Antibodies and Novel Scaffolds", FRONTIERS IN IMMUNOLOGY, (20170126), vol. 8, doi:10.3389/fimmu.2017.00038, XP055396345 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3389/fimmu.2017.00038 |