EP3730126 - LIQUID COMPOSITION COMPRISING VEGF ANTAGONIST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | New entry: Decision on request for further processing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd. 107, Cheomdan-daero Yeonsu-gu Incheon 21987 / KR | [2020/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Inae 1004-302, 25-19, Ttukseom-ro 34-gil Gwangjin-gu Seoul 05090 / KR | 02 /
JUNG, Youngseok B1616, 16F, 203, Art center-daero Yeonsu-gu Incheon 22008 / KR | 03 /
JANG, Yong Min 3F, 25, Jinhwangdo-ro 23-gil Gangdong-gu Seoul 05334 / KR | 04 /
YOO, Wonjung 102-2701, 197, Haeundaehaebyeon-ro Haeundae-gu Busan 48093 / KR | 05 /
LEE, Jaemin 102-301, 38-6, Toseong-ro Songpa-gu Seoul 05536 / KR | 06 /
KIM, Yongkook 102-3301, 160, Central-ro Yeonsu-gu Incheon 22003 / KR | [2020/44] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2020/44] | Application number, filing date | 18893272.7 | 18.12.2018 | [2020/44] | WO2018KR16156 | Priority number, date | KR20170178693 | 22.12.2017 Original published format: KR 20170178693 | [2020/44] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019124946 | Date: | 27.06.2019 | Language: | KO | [2019/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3730126 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.06.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/08, A61K47/12, A61K47/18, A61K47/26, A61K38/17, A61K9/00 | [2020/44] | CPC: |
A61K9/0019 (EP);
A61K38/17 (IL);
A61K9/08 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K9/0048 (IL,KR,US);
A61K38/179 (EP,KR);
A61K47/02 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K47/12 (IL,KR);
A61K47/18 (IL);
A61K47/183 (EP);
A61K47/22 (KR);
A61K47/26 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K9/00 (IL);
A61P27/02 (KR);
C07K14/49 (IL,US);
C07K2319/30 (IL,US);
C07K2319/32 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] | Title | German: | VEGF-ANTAGONIST ENTHALTENDE FLÜSSIGE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2020/44] | English: | LIQUID COMPOSITION COMPRISING VEGF ANTAGONIST | [2020/44] | French: | COMPOSITION LIQUIDE COMPRENANT UN ANTAGONISTE DU VEGF | [2020/44] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2020 | Translation filed | 09.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2020 | Search fee paid | 09.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 21.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 20.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 14.05.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 09.10.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 14.05.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 14.05.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.05.2024 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 02.10.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 02.10.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.10.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2007149334 (REGENERON PHARMA [US], et al); | [XI]US2013101584 (MANNING MARK [US], et al); | [I]WO2014160490 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al); | [I]WO2016208989 (ALTEOGEN INC [KR]); | [I]WO2017117202 (ONCOBIOLOGICS INC [US]); | [E]EP3790532 (REGENERON PHARMA [US]) | International search | [Y]KR20080015780 (REGENERON PHARMA [US]); | [Y]KR20090018807 (REGENERON PHARMA [US]); | [A]KR101482304B ; | [XY]KR20170000356 (ALTEOGEN INC [KR]); | [Y]US2017080086 (VITTI ROBERT L [US], et al) |