EP3710785 - AUTOMATIC SELECTION OF MAP DETAIL LEVELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.06.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Uber Technologies, Inc. 1455 Market Street San Francisco, California 94103 / US | [2020/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Seung Woo 1455 Market Street San Francisco, California 94103 / US | 02 /
MOORE, Christopher 1455 Market Street San Francisco, California 94103 / US | [2020/39] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/39] | Grant, David Michael Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | Application number, filing date | 18895379.8 | 22.12.2018 | [2020/39] | WO2018IB60551 | Priority number, date | US201762612558P | 31.12.2017 Original published format: US 201762612558 P | [2020/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019130204 | Date: | 04.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3710785 | Date: | 23.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.07.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/36, G01C21/32, G01C21/34, G01C21/00 | [2021/40] | CPC: |
G01C21/367 (EP,US);
G01C21/3676 (US);
G01C21/3682 (US);
G01C21/3881 (EP,US);
G01C21/3889 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/39] | G01C21/36, G01C21/32, G01C21/34 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/39] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE AUSWAHL VON KARTENDETAILSTUFEN | [2020/39] | English: | AUTOMATIC SELECTION OF MAP DETAIL LEVELS | [2020/39] | French: | SÉLECTION AUTOMATIQUE DES NIVEAUX DE DÉTAIL D'UNE CARTE | [2020/39] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2020 | Search fee paid | 19.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/39] | 08.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007288162 (FURUKAWA HIDEO [US]); | [Y]US2010324816 (HIGHSTROM MATTHEW M [US], et al); | [XYI]US2013147846 (KALAI ILJYA [CH], et al) | International search | [A]JP2000081339 (EQUOS RES CO LTD); | [XY]US2007288162 (FURUKAWA HIDEO [US]); | [Y]US2010324816 (HIGHSTROM MATTHEW M [US], et al); | [A]US2016102988 (KALAI ILJYA [CH], et al); | [A]US2017192637 (REN LIU [US], et al) | by applicant | US2007288162 | US2010324816 | US2013147846 |