EP3718385 - SYSTEM FOR SENSOR UTILIZATION IN A TRANSFORMER COOLING CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Energy Ltd Brown-Boveri-Strasse 5 8050 Zürich / CH | [2023/50] |
Former [2022/03] | For all designated states Hitachi Energy Switzerland AG Bruggerstrasse 72 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2020/41] | For all designated states ABB Power Grids Switzerland AG Bruggerstrasse 72 5400 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LORIN, Pierre Route de Piotte 47 1965 Savièse / CH | 02 /
CHEIM, Luiz 1105 Barley Stone Way Raleigh, North Carolina 27603 / US | [2020/41] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2020/41] | Application number, filing date | 18895771.6 | 31.12.2018 | [2020/41] | WO2018US68143 | Priority number, date | US201762612377P | 30.12.2017 Original published format: US 201762612377 P | [2020/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019133972 | Date: | 04.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3718385 | Date: | 07.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3718385 | Date: | 21.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.07.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/20, H01F27/02, H01F27/08, H01F27/10 | [2020/41] | CPC: |
H01F27/12 (EP);
H01F27/402 (EP,US);
G01K13/00 (US);
G01N33/2841 (US);
G01N33/2847 (US);
H01F27/02 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR SENSORVERWENDUNG IN EINEM TRANSFORMATORKÜHLKREISLAUF | [2020/41] | English: | SYSTEM FOR SENSOR UTILIZATION IN A TRANSFORMER COOLING CIRCUIT | [2020/41] | French: | SYSTÈME D'UTILISATION DE CAPTEUR DANS UN CIRCUIT DE REFROIDISSEMENT DE TRANSFORMATEUR | [2020/41] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2020 | Search fee paid | 30.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/41] | 10.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6401518 (O'KEEFFE THOMAS G [US], et al) [Y] 1-6 * column 2, line 12 - line 21 * * column 2, line 55 - line 59 * * column 3, line 4 - line 8 * * column 3, line 21 - line 27 * * column 4, line 33 - line 51 * * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 3; figures 1,2 * * column 6, line 3 - line 9 * * column 4, line 43 - line 47 *; | [Y]EP2899728 (ABB TECHNOLOGY LTD [CH]) [Y] 1-6 * figure 2 ** paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0033] *; | [Y]US2017168034 (FENTON ROGER ALAN [US]) [Y] 1-6 * paragraph [0219]; figure 5 * | International search | [YA]US6401518 (O'KEEFFE THOMAS G [US], et al) [Y] 1-8, 10-13, 15-20 * , col. 2 Ins 12-21, 33-36, 55-59, col. 3 Ins 4-8, 21-27, col. 4 Ins 43-47, col. 5 Ins 66-67, col. 4 Ins 43-47, col. 6 Ins 1-9; FIGS. 1 and 2 * [A] 9, 14; | [YA]US2017168034 (FENTON ROGER ALAN [US]) [Y] 1-8, 10-13,15-20 * , paras [0005], [0049], [0135], [0147], [0160]; FIGS. 10A, 11A-B * [A] 9, 14; | [A]WO2017125407 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 9, 14* , Fig. 1 * | by applicant | US6401518 | EP2899728 | US2017168034 |