EP3734789 - POWER STORAGE DEVICE, POWER STORAGE SYSTEM, POWER SUPPLY SYSTEM, AND CONTROL METHOD FOR POWER STORAGE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.10.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KANEKA CORPORATION 2-3-18, Nakanoshima Kita-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8288 / JP | [2020/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWABE, Masaru c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 5-1-1, Torikainishi Settsu-shi, Osaka 566-0072 / JP | 02 /
MATSUDA, Takashi c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 5-1-1, Torikainishi Settsu-shi, Osaka 566-0072 / JP | 03 /
SATO, Yukinari c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 5-1-1, Torikainishi Settsu-shi, Osaka 566-0072 / JP | [2020/45] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2020/45] | Application number, filing date | 18898459.5 | 12.09.2018 | [2020/45] | WO2018JP33791 | Priority number, date | JP20180000450 | 05.01.2018 Original published format: JP 2018000450 | JP20180031168 | 23.02.2018 Original published format: JP 2018031168 | [2020/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019135300 | Date: | 11.07.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3734789 | Date: | 04.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.07.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00, G01R31/36, H01M10/48 | [2020/45] | CPC: |
H02J7/0048 (EP);
H02J7/007194 (US);
G01R31/36 (EP);
H01M10/48 (EP,US);
H02J7/0047 (US);
H02J7/0068 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/45] | Title | German: | ENERGIESPEICHERVORRICHTUNG, ENERGIESPEICHERSYSTEM, ENERGIEVERSORGUNGSSYSTEM UND STEUERVERFAHREN FÜR EINE ENERGIESPEICHERVORRICHTUNG | [2020/45] | English: | POWER STORAGE DEVICE, POWER STORAGE SYSTEM, POWER SUPPLY SYSTEM, AND CONTROL METHOD FOR POWER STORAGE DEVICE | [2020/45] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE D'ÉNERGIE, SYSTÈME DE STOCKAGE D'ÉNERGIE, SYSTÈME D'ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE D'ÉNERGIE | [2020/45] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2020 | Translation filed | 28.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2020 | Search fee paid | 28.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/45] | 25.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP1892813 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) [I] 1-11 * paragraphs [0042] , [0071] - [0084]; figure 1 *; | [A]EP2023153 (MITSUMI ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-11* paragraph [0017] *; | [I]US2012105014 (NAKAYAMA MASATO [JP], et al) [I] 1-11 * paragraphs [0036] - [0070]; figure 1 * | International search | [YA]WO2012165629 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-5, 7-9, 11 * , paragraphs [0017]-[0019], [0056]-[0059] & US 9093864 B2 & EP 2717422 A1, paragraphs [0016]-[0018], [0049]-[0052] * [A] 6, 10; | [YA]JP2014119394 (SHARP KK) [Y] 1-5, 7-9, 11 * , paragraphs [0002], [0004], [0012]-[0044], fig. 1-3 (Family: none) * [A] 6, 10; | [A]JP2015045561 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-11 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *; | [YA]JP2015059816 (KAYABA INDUSTRY CO LTD) [Y] 1-5, 7-9, 11 * , paragraphs [0057], [0058] (Family: none) * [A] 6, 10; | [Y]JP2017125699 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [Y] 5 * , paragraphs [0062]-[0065] (Family: none) *; | [PA]WO2018008469 (KANEKA CORP [JP]) [PA] 1-11* , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) * | by applicant | JP2016025760 |