EP3738774 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING CAN FOR BEVERAGE, CAN FOR BEVERAGE, AND BEVERAGE CAN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.06.2023 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALTEMIRA Co., Ltd. 1-4-25, Kouraku Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112-8525 / JP | [2022/41] |
Former [2022/38] | For all designated states ALTEMIRA Co., Ltd. 1-4-25, Kouraku Bunkyo-ku, Tokyo 1128525 / JP | ||
Former [2022/11] | For all designated states Showa Aluminum Can Corporation 30-2, Nishigotanda 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0031 / JP | ||
Former [2022/10] | For all designated states Showa Aluminium Can Global Corporation 30-2 Nishigotanda 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0031 / JP | ||
Former [2020/47] | For all designated states Showa Aluminum Can Corporation 30-2 Nishigotanda 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0031 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OJIMA, Shinichi c/o SHOWA ALUMINUM CAN CORPORATION, 30-2, Nishigotanda 1-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0031 / JP | 02 /
IKEDA, Kazunori c/o SHOWA ALUMINUM CAN CORPORATION, 30-2, Nishigotanda 1-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0031 / JP | 03 /
MASUDA, Kazuhisa c/o SHOWA ALUMINUM CAN CORPORATION, 30-2, Nishigotanda 1-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0031 / JP | 04 /
MATSUSHIMA, Hitomi c/o SHOWA ALUMINUM CAN CORPORATION, 30-2, Nishigotanda 1-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0031 / JP | [2020/47] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2020/47] | Application number, filing date | 18900002.9 | 17.12.2018 | [2020/47] | WO2018JP46330 | Priority number, date | JP20180001181 | 09.01.2018 Original published format: JP 2018001181 | [2020/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019138790 | Date: | 18.07.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3738774 | Date: | 18.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.07.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/01, B41F17/22, B41M1/28, B65D25/20, B41F19/00, B41J3/407, B41M1/40, B41M5/00, B65B61/02 | [2021/40] | CPC: |
B41F19/007 (EP);
B41F17/22 (EP,US);
B41J2/2103 (US);
B41J3/40733 (EP);
B41J3/546 (US);
B41M1/02 (US);
B41M1/28 (EP,US);
B41M1/40 (EP);
B41M5/0047 (EP);
B41M5/0058 (EP);
B41M5/0088 (EP);
B65D25/34 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/47] | B41J2/01, B41F17/22, B41M1/28, B65D25/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/47] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER DOSE FÜR GETRÄNKE, DOSE FÜR GETRÄNKE UND GETRÄNKEDOSE | [2020/47] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING CAN FOR BEVERAGE, CAN FOR BEVERAGE, AND BEVERAGE CAN | [2020/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CANETTE POUR BOISSON, CANETTE POUR BOISSON ET CANETTE DE BOISSON | [2020/47] | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2020 | Translation filed | 09.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2020 | Search fee paid | 09.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/47] | 09.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2013176358 (YAMADA KOJI [JP], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0041] - [0043] - [0 84] , [ 116] , [ 126]; figures 1-4, 12, 13 *; | [I]JP2016198732 (SHOWA ALUMINIUM CAN KK) [I] 1,7,8,12-15* paragraphs [0023] - [0025]; figure 2 *; | [I]US2017157964 (IZUME MASAYUKI [JP]) [I] 1,7,8,12-15 * paragraphs [0021] , [0 48] , [0 49] , [0 93] - [0095] - [0 99]; figures 1, 11 * | International search | [XY]JP2012086870 (TOYO SEIKAN KAISHA LTD) [X] 1-15 * , * [Y] 4, 10-11; | [XY]JP2016032879 (AIMAA PLANNING KK) [X] 1-3, 5-9, 12-15 * , * [Y] 4, 10-11; | [A]JP3205505U [A] 1-15 * , *; | [A]WO2017208145 (LANDA LABS (2012) LTD [IL]) [A] 1-15* , & WO 2017/208146 A1 * | by applicant | JP2012232771 |