EP3739545 - IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD AND APPARATUS, VEHICLE-MOUNTED HEAD UP DISPLAY SYSTEM, AND VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO., LTD. No. 10 Jiuxianqiao Rd. Chaoyang District Beijing 100015 / CN | [2020/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Naifu No.9 Dize Rd., BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 02 /
MA, Xitong No.9 Dize Rd., BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 03 /
LIU, Xiangyang No.9 Dize Rd., BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | [2020/47] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/47] | AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 18900446.8 | 25.10.2018 | [2020/47] | WO2018CN111905 | Priority number, date | CN20181032426 | 12.01.2018 Original published format: CN201810032426 | [2020/47] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019137065 | Date: | 18.07.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3739545 | Date: | 18.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 18.07.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06T5/00, G06T7/70 | [2021/45] | CPC: |
B60K35/00 (EP,US);
G06T7/70 (EP,CN);
G06T5/80 (EP,CN,US);
B60K35/10 (EP);
B60K35/23 (EP,US);
G02B27/0093 (EP);
G02B27/0101 (EP,US);
G02B27/0179 (US);
G06T7/74 (US);
B60K2360/149 (EP);
B60K35/658 (US);
G02B2027/011 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/47] | G06T5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/47] | Title | German: | BILDVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG, FAHRZEUGMONTIERTES HEAD-UP-ANZEIGESYSTEM UND FAHRZEUG | [2020/47] | English: | IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD AND APPARATUS, VEHICLE-MOUNTED HEAD UP DISPLAY SYSTEM, AND VEHICLE | [2020/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE, SYSTÈME D'AFFICHAGE TÊTE HAUTE MONTÉ SUR VÉHICULE, ET VÉHICULE | [2020/47] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2020 | Translation filed | 20.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2020 | Search fee paid | 20.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/47] | 25.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - Sato Akihiko ET AL, "VISUAL NAVIGATION SYSTEM ON WINDSHIELD HEAD-UP DISPLAY", (20060101), URL: http://www.kameda-lab.org/research/publication/2006/200610_ITSWC/200610_ITSWC_sato.pdf, (20210927), XP055844647 [X] 1-15 * abstract * * section: Distortion correction; page 3 - page 4; figures 2, 3 * | [A] - ITOH YUTA ET AL, "Simultaneous Direct and Augmented View Distortion Calibration of Optical See-Through Head-Mounted Displays", 2015 IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON MIXED AND AUGMENTED REALITY, IEEE, (20150929), doi:10.1109/ISMAR.2015.14, pages 43 - 48, XP032809431 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISMAR.2015.14 | [A] - JENS GRUBERT ET AL, "A Survey of Calibration Methods for Optical See-Through Head-Mounted Displays", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20170913), doi:10.1109/TVCG.2017.2754257, XP080820787 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TVCG.2017.2754257 | [A] - STANISLAVS BARDINS ET AL, "Gaze-based interaction in various environments", PROCEEDING OF THE 1ST ACM WORKSHOP ON VISION NETWORKS FOR BEHAVIOR ANALYSIS, VNBA '08, ACM PRESS, NEW YORK, NEW YORK, USA, (20081031), doi:10.1145/1461893.1461903, ISBN 978-1-60558-313-6, pages 47 - 54, XP058211300 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1461893.1461903 |