EP3741559 - SILICA-COATED DEPOSIT LAYER FORMED BY PLATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.12.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Taiyo Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 2-27 Morishoji 1-Chome Asahi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 535-0013 / JP | For all designated states Okuno Chemical Industries Co., Ltd. 4-7-10, Doshomachi Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0045 / JP | [2020/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARIMITSU, Yasushi c/o Taiyo Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 2-27 Morishoji, 1-Chome, Asahi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 535-0013 / JP | 02 /
OKANO, Kazuyuki c/o Taiyo Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 2-27 Morishoji, 1-Chome, Asahi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 535-0013 / JP | 03 /
SHIMAHASHI, Katsumasa c/o General Head Research of OKUNO CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES CO., LTD. 1-10-25, Hanaten-higashi, Tsurumi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 538-0044 / JP | 04 /
KONUMA, Taro c/o General Head Research of OKUNO CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES CO., LTD. 1-10-25, Hanaten-higashi, Tsurumi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 538-0044 / JP | 05 /
KATO, Takashi c/o General Head Research of OKUNO CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES CO., LTD. 1-10-25, Hanaten-higashi, Tsurumi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 538-0044 / JP | [2024/03] |
Former [2020/48] | 01 /
ARIMITSU Yasushi c/o Taiyo Manufacturing Co., Ltd., 2-27 Morishoji 1-Chome, Asahi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 535-0013 / JP | ||
02 /
OKANO Kazuyuki c/o Taiyo Manufacturing Co., Ltd., 2-27 Morishoji 1-Chome, Asahi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 535-0013 / JP | |||
03 /
SHIMAHASHI Katsumasa c/o General Head Research of OKUNO CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES CO., LTD., 1-10-25, Hanaten-higashi Tsurumi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 538-0044 / JP | |||
04 /
KONUMA Taro c/o General Head Research of OKUNO CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES CO., LTD., 1-10-25, Hanaten-higashi Tsurumi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 538-0044 / JP | |||
05 /
KATO Takashi c/o General Head Research of OKUNO CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES CO., LTD., 1-10-25, Hanaten-higashi Tsurumi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 538-0044 / JP | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [2020/48] | Application number, filing date | 18901550.6 | 25.12.2018 | [2020/48] | WO2018JP47555 | Priority number, date | JP20180004908 | 16.01.2018 Original published format: JP 2018004908 | [2020/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019142616 | Date: | 25.07.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3741559 | Date: | 25.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.07.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C08J7/04, B05D3/14, B05D3/02, B05D3/10, B05D7/00 | [2023/48] | CPC: |
C08J7/0423 (EP,KR);
B05D3/10 (KR);
C23C18/1641 (US);
B05D7/24 (KR);
B32B15/04 (US);
B32B15/20 (US);
B32B27/06 (KR,US);
C23C18/1653 (US);
C23C18/1689 (US);
C23C18/32 (US);
C23C28/023 (US);
C25D3/38 (US);
C25D5/48 (US);
C25D5/56 (US);
B05D2201/02 (EP);
B05D2601/22 (EP);
B05D3/0254 (EP);
B05D3/102 (EP);
B05D3/142 (EP);
B05D7/53 (EP);
C08J2309/02 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/38] | B32B27/06, B05D3/10, B05D7/24, C08J7/04 | ||
Former IPC [2020/48] | B32B27/06, B05D3/10, B05D7/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/48] | Title | German: | DURCH PLATTIEREN GEBILDETER, MIT SILICIUMDIOXID BESCHICHTETER ÜBERZUG | [2020/48] | English: | SILICA-COATED DEPOSIT LAYER FORMED BY PLATING | [2020/48] | French: | COUCHE DE DÉPÔT REVÊTUE DE SILICE FORMÉE PAR PLACAGE | [2020/48] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2020 | Translation filed | 30.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2020 | Search fee paid | 30.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/48] | 21.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/38] | 15.05.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]JP2012206326 ; | [X]JP2003238901 ; | [XYI]US2006014024 (ITAKURA TATSUYA [JP], et al) [X] 1,6-9,13,14 * paragraphs [0007] , [0094] - [0097] - [0109]; example -; claim 1; table 1 * [Y] 5,9 [I] 2-4,10-12; | [XYI] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2012, no. 71, Database accession no. 2012-N66805, XP002803913 & JP2012206326 A 20121025 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD) [X] 1-3,5-8,10,11,13,14 * abstract * [Y] 5,9 [I] 4,12 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2004, no. 25, Database accession no. 2004-259753, XP002803914 & JP2003238901 A 20030827 (DAINIPPON TORYO KK) [X] 1,6-8,13,14 * abstract * | International search | [XY]JPH08225920 (TOKAI RIKA CO LTD) [X] 1, 2, 6-8, 10, 13, 14 * , *[Y] 5, 7, 9, 14; | [XY]JPH1178673 (KOITO MFG CO LTD) [X] 1-8, 10-14 * , * [Y] 5, 7, 9, 14; | [XY]JP2003155580 (TOYODA GOSEI KK) [X] 1-4, 6-14 * , * [Y] 5, 7, 9, 14; | [XY]JP2004203014 (TOYODA GOSEI KK) [X] 1-4, 6-14 * , * [Y] 5, 7, 9, 14; | [XY]JP2013202818 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD) [X] 1-6, 8-13 * , * [Y] 5, 7, 9, 14 | by applicant | JP2002241948 | JP2005231219 | JP2015221528 |