EP3628132 - DEVICE-CAPABILITY-BASED AND STANDALONE PAGING IN NEW RADIO UNLICENSED BAND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.02.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.02.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2020/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KODALI, Sree Ram One Apple Park Way Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 02 /
GURUMOORTHY, Setguraman One Apple Park Way Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 03 /
NIMMALA, Srinivasan One Apple Park Way Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 04 /
CHEN, Yuqin Mail Stop 850-8RE 25F International Finance Centre 8 Jianguomenwai Avenue Chaoyang District, Beijing 100022 / CN | 05 /
OU, Xu One Apple Park Way Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 06 /
XING, Longda One Apple Park Way Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 07 /
LOVLEKAR, Srirang A. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 08 /
XU, Fangli Mail Stop 850-8RE 25F International Finance Centre 8 Jianguomenwai Avenue Chaoyang District, Beijing 100022 / CN | 09 /
ZHANG, Dawei One Apple Park Way Cupertino, California 95014 / US | [2020/14] | Representative(s) | Lang, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2020/14] | Application number, filing date | 18901812.0 | 03.08.2018 | [2020/14] | WO2018CN98584 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020024278 | Date: | 06.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3628132 | Date: | 01.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W68/02, H04W52/02, // H04W68/00, H04W74/08, H04W76/27, H04W76/28 | [2021/02] | CPC: |
H04W52/0216 (EP);
H04W68/02 (KR);
H04W88/184 (US);
H04W52/0229 (EP,KR);
H04W52/0241 (US);
H04W68/005 (EP,US);
H04W68/025 (EP);
H04W74/0833 (EP,KR);
H04W76/27 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/14] | H04W68/02, H04W52/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/14] | Title | German: | AUF GERÄTEKAPAZITÄT BASIERENDER UND EIGENSTÄNDIGER FUNKRUF IN EINEM UNLIZENZIERTEN BAND IN NEW RADIO | [2020/14] | English: | DEVICE-CAPABILITY-BASED AND STANDALONE PAGING IN NEW RADIO UNLICENSED BAND | [2020/14] | French: | RADIOMESSAGERIE AUTONOME BASÉE SUR LA CAPACITÉ D'UN DISPOSITIF DANS UNE NOUVELLE BANDE SANS LICENCE RADIO | [2020/14] | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.2019 | Search fee paid | 02.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CN | 02.08.2019 | Examination requested [2020/14] | 28.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2017166313 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | International search | [A]CN103379593 (ZTE CORP); | [X]US2015109981 (PATIL ABHISHEK PRAMOD [US], et al); | [A]US2016270027 (ANG PETER PUI LOK [US], et al); | [A]US2018049156 (LAHA SUBHASIS [US], et al) |