EP3748697 - SOLAR CELL, MULTI-JUNCTION SOLAR CELL, SOLAR CELL MODULE AND SOLAR POWER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.11.2020 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | For all designated states Toshiba Energy Systems & Solutions Corporation 72-34, Horikawa-cho Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 2120013 / JP | [2020/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIBASAKI, Soichiro c/o IP Div. Toshiba Corp. (K. K. TOSHIBA), 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 02 /
YAMAZAKI, Mutsuki c/o IP Div. Toshiba Corp. (K. K. TOSHIBA), 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 03 /
YAMAMOTO, Kazushige c/o IP Div. Toshiba Corp. (K. K. TOSHIBA), 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 04 /
HONISHI, Yuya c/o Intellectual Property Group, Toshiba Energy Systems & Solutions Corporation, 72-34, Horikawa- cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 212-0013 / JP | [2020/50] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/50] | Application number, filing date | 18902794.9 | 29.01.2018 | [2020/50] | WO2018JP02789 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019146119 | Date: | 01.08.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3748697 | Date: | 09.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.08.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/0224, H01L31/0336 | [2021/39] | CPC: |
H01L31/0336 (EP);
H01L31/0445 (US);
H01L31/022425 (EP);
H01L31/022466 (EP);
H01L31/022475 (US);
H01L31/022483 (US);
H01L31/032 (EP,US);
H01L31/046 (EP);
H01L31/0687 (US);
H01L31/072 (EP,US);
H01L31/0725 (EP,US);
H02S40/38 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/50] | H01L31/072 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/50] | Title | German: | SOLARZELLE, MEHRFACHSOLARZELLE, SOLARZELLENMODUL UND SOLARSTROMERZEUGUNGSSYSTEM | [2020/50] | English: | SOLAR CELL, MULTI-JUNCTION SOLAR CELL, SOLAR CELL MODULE AND SOLAR POWER SYSTEM | [2020/50] | French: | CELLULE SOLAIRE, CELLULE SOLAIRE À JONCTIONS MULTIPLES, MODULE DE CELLULE SOLAIRE ET SYSTÈME D'ÉNERGIE SOLAIRE | [2020/50] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2020 | Translation filed | 20.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2020 | Search fee paid | 20.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/50] | 08.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]JP2017059656 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1,4,7-9,12,13,16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] - [0033] * * figures 1,2 * [A] 2,3,5,6,10,11 [I] 14,15; | [A] - JAYAKRISHNAN R, "Negative resistance in Cu2O/In2S3heterostructure", MATERIALS CHEMISTRY AND PHYSICS, (20150624), vol. 162, doi:10.1016/J.MATCHEMPHYS.2015.06.025, ISSN 0254-0584, pages 542 - 547, XP029251758 [A] 1-16 * page 546; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.matchemphys.2015.06.025 | International search | [Y]JPS6273782 (TAIYO YUDEN KK) [Y] 1-16 * , *; | [Y]JPS6293804 (TDK CORP) [Y] 1-16 * , *; | [A]JP2001015785 (STAR MFG CO) [A] 1-16 * , *; | [Y]JP2006124754 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [Y] 5-6; | [A]US2012097227 (LIM JUNGWOOK [KR], et al) [A] 1-16* , [0030] - [0036], 1 & KR 10-2012-0041942 A *; | [Y]JP2012186415 (KANAZAWA INST OF TECHNOLOGY) [Y] 12-13, 15 * , *; | [A]JP2014183244 (UNIV SHIGA PREFECTURE) [A] 1-16 * , *; | [X]JP2017059656 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1, 3-4, 8-10, 12-16 * , *; | [Y] - SEPTINA, W. et al., "Potentiostatic electrodeposition of cuprous oxide thin films for photovoltaic applications", ELECTROCHIMICA ACTA, (20110226), vol. 56, doi:doi:10.1016/j.electacta.2011.02.075, pages 4882 - 4888, XP028208161 [Y] 1-16 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.electacta.2011.02.075 | by applicant | JP2017098479 |