EP3697303 - TRANSCUTANEOUS WEARABLE APPARATUS FOR CONTINUOUS MONITORING OF BIOMARKERS IN BLOOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.09.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.10.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rutgers, the State University of New Jersey 83 Somerset Street New Brunswick, NJ 08901 / US | For all designated states The Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania Suite 200 3160 Chestnut Street Philadelphia, PA 19104-3242 / US | [2020/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XIE, Pengfei 94 Brett Road Piscataway, NJ 08854 / US | 02 /
JAVANMARD, Mehdi 17 Greene Drive West Windsor, NJ 08550 / US | 03 /
ALLEN, Mark, George 2037 Spruce Street Philadelphia, PA 19103 / US | 04 /
SHEN, Wen 2815 Turnberry Dr., Apt 714 Arlington, TX 76006 / US | 05 /
SONG, Naixin 4111 Walnut Street, Apt. 202 Philadelphia, PA 19104 / US | [2020/35] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 11394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | [2020/35] | Application number, filing date | 18903032.3 | 19.10.2018 | [2020/35] | WO2018US56718 | Priority number, date | US201762575254P | 20.10.2017 Original published format: US 201762575254 P | [2020/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019190596 | Date: | 03.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3697303 | Date: | 26.08.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3697303 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/145, A61B5/00, A61B5/053, G01N33/48 | [2020/35] | CPC: |
A61B5/14546 (EP);
B01L3/5085 (US);
A61B5/0538 (EP);
A61B5/14503 (EP);
A61B5/685 (EP);
G01N27/02 (US);
G01N33/6863 (US);
B01L2300/0636 (US);
B01L2300/0645 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRANSKUTANE TRAGBARE VORRICHTUNG ZUR KONTINUIERLICHEN ÜBERWACHUNG VON BIOMARKERN IM BLUT | [2020/35] | English: | TRANSCUTANEOUS WEARABLE APPARATUS FOR CONTINUOUS MONITORING OF BIOMARKERS IN BLOOD | [2020/35] | French: | APPAREIL À PORTER TRANSCUTANÉ POUR LA SURVEILLANCE CONTINUE DE BIOMARQUEURS DANS LE SANG | [2020/35] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/35] | 15.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 11.12.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.03.2023 | CZ | 08.03.2023 | DK | 08.03.2023 | EE | 08.03.2023 | ES | 08.03.2023 | FI | 08.03.2023 | HR | 08.03.2023 | IT | 08.03.2023 | LT | 08.03.2023 | LV | 08.03.2023 | MC | 08.03.2023 | NL | 08.03.2023 | PL | 08.03.2023 | RO | 08.03.2023 | RS | 08.03.2023 | SE | 08.03.2023 | SI | 08.03.2023 | SK | 08.03.2023 | SM | 08.03.2023 | NO | 08.06.2023 | GR | 09.06.2023 | IS | 08.07.2023 | PT | 10.07.2023 | LU | 19.10.2023 | BE | 31.10.2023 | CH | 31.10.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
DK | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
IT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
MC | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SI | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
LU | 19.10.2023 | ||
CH | 31.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/30] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
DK | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
IT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
MC | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SI | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
LU | 19.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
DK | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
IT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
MC | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SI | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
DK | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
IT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SI | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
DK | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SI | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
LT | 08.03.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US2004072357 (STIENE MATTHIAS [GB], et al) [X] 1,5,6,13-15,17,18 * paragraphs [0052] - [0054] - [0 70] , [0 79] , [0 93] , [0 96] , [ 101] - [0110] - [ 111] * * figures 2, 3, 4a, 4b, 5a-5h, 6a, 6b * [Y] 22-25 [I] 11,16; | [XYI]US2014012114 (ZEVENBERGEN MARCEL [NL], et al) [X] 1-4,8,9,12-15,17-19 * paragraphs [0055] , [0 65] , [ 113] - [0118] * * figure 9 * [Y] 22-25 [I] 7,11,16; | [A]US2014249435 (BANET MATT [US], et al) [A] 16* paragraphs [0111] , [ 112] *; | [XI]US9234867 (BRIMAN MIKHAIL [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8,9,12,17,19 * column 7, line 60 - column 8, line 3 * * column 8, lines 17-21 * * column 16, lines 4-20, 30-41 * * column 17, lines 4-52 * * column 20, line 44 - column 21, line 13 * * column 22, lines 18-29 * * figures 1, 14, 16A, 16B, 22, 25 * * column 26, lines 38-42 * [I] 7,10,11,16,20,21; | [A]WO2016100325 (VIRGINIA TECH INTELL PROP [US]) [A] 10,20,21 * page 24 - page 25 * | by applicant | US2014147336 | WO2017062591 | - J. S. DANIELSN. POURMAND, Electroanalysis, (20070516), pages 1239 - 1257 | - EMAMINEJAD, S.JAVANMARD, M.DUTTON, R. W.DAVIS, R. W., "Microfluidic diagnostic tool for the developing world: Contactless impedance flow cytometry", Lab on a Chip, (20120000), vol. 12, no. 21, pages 4499 - 4507 | WO2016US55706 |