EP3650094 - MAGNETIC CHIP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.04.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.10.2023 [2023/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Salens Toys (Shanghai) Co., Ltd. No. 18 of Building 19 No. 2183, Songzheng Road Shihudang Town Songjiang District Shanghai 201604 / CN | [2020/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHOU, Zhiwei No.18 Of Building 19, No. 2183 Songzheng Road, Shihudang Town Songjiang District Shangai 201604 / CN | [2021/04] | Representative(s) | Bryers Intellectual Property Ltd Bristol & Bath Science Park Dirac Crescent, Emerson's Green Bristol, BS16 7FR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/20] | Bryers LLP 7 Gay Street Bath, Bath and North East Somerset BA1 2PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 18903045.5 | 10.10.2018 | [2020/20] | WO2018CN109638 | Priority number, date | CN201811116957 | 25.09.2018 Original published format: CN201811116957 | [2020/20] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020062325 | Date: | 02.04.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3650094 | Date: | 13.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A63H33/04, A63H33/26 | [2020/20] | CPC: |
A63H33/046 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A63H33/042 (EP,KR,US);
A63H33/26 (CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/50] |
Former [2020/20] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MAGNETFOLIE | [2020/20] | English: | MAGNETIC CHIP | [2020/20] | French: | PUCE MAGNÉTIQUE | [2020/20] | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2019 | Translation filed | 21.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2019 | Search fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2020 | Examination requested [2020/50] | 04.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/40] | 30.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/40] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 04.11.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 04.11.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.11.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 04.11.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 04.11.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.11.2020 | Decision despatched | 04.11.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 04.11.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.11.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2022 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]CN205627097U (XIONG GUANGLIE) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 2-4,7-10 [I] 5,6; | [Y]WO2015038581 (BOX TILES LLC [US], et al) [Y] 2-4 * paragraphs [118]-[120]; figures 48, 49 *; | [Y]US2017232357 (ROSEN LAWRENCE [US], et al) [Y] 7,8 * paragraphs [23]-[24], [29]; figures 3, 4 *; | [Y]KR20130094550 (PARK KEE YOUNG [KR]) [Y] 9,10 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2011139013 (NABIBOOKS COM [KR], et al) [Y] 9,10 * the whole document *; | [A]CN107510946 (LYU HUIXUE) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |