EP3596693 - A PUBLICLY ACCESSIBLE URBAN BEACH ENTERTAINMENT COMPLEX WITH A CENTERPIECE MAN-MADE TROPICAL-STYLE LAGOON AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING EFFICIENT UTILIZATION OF LIMITED USE LAND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.10.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Crystal Lagoons Technologies, Inc. 2 Alhambra Plaza, Penthouse 1B Coral Gables FL 33134 / US | [2023/17] |
Former [2020/18] | For all designated states Crystal Lagoons Technologies, Inc. 1209 Orange Street Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | ||
Former [2020/04] | For all designated states Crystal Lagoons (Curaçao) B.V. Kaya W.F.G. (Jombi) Mensing 14 / CW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FISCHMANN TORRES, Fernando, Benjamin Avda. Kennedy 9070, 10th Floor Las Condes Santiago / CL | [2020/04] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Olbricht Buchhold Keulertz Partnerschaft mbB Neue Mainzer Straße 75 60311 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/04] | Herrmann, Uwe Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18903227.9 | 21.08.2018 | [2020/04] | WO2018IB01084 | Priority number, date | US201862625182P | 01.02.2018 Original published format: US 201862625182 P | US201862639211P | 06.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862639211 P | US201815990141 | 25.05.2018 Original published format: US201815990141 | [2020/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019150159 | Date: | 08.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3596693 | Date: | 22.01.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.08.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q90/00, G06Q99/00, A63G31/00, C02F103/00, C02F103/42, E04H4/00, E04H4/12, C02F1/00, C02F1/50, E04H3/10, E04H4/14 | [2020/04] | CPC: |
G06Q99/00 (EP,IL,KR,US);
E04H3/10 (EP,IL,US);
A63G31/00 (IL,KR);
A63G31/007 (CN,IL,KR);
C02F1/004 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C02F1/50 (EP,IL,KR,US);
E01F13/00 (CN);
E03B1/00 (CN);
E04B1/342 (IL,KR,US);
E04H14/00 (CN);
E04H17/00 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
E04H3/02 (IL,KR,US);
E04H3/14 (IL,US);
E04H3/22 (IL,KR,US);
E04H4/00 (EP,CN,IL,US);
E04H4/0006 (IL,KR,US);
E04H4/12 (EP,IL,US);
E04H4/1218 (IL,US);
E04H4/1281 (IL,KR,US);
E04H4/129 (KR);
E04H4/14 (EP,IL,US);
E04H4/144 (IL,US);
E04H4/148 (KR);
E04H4/16 (KR);
E06B11/02 (IL,US);
E06B11/08 (IL,US);
G06Q90/00 (EP,IL,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/04] | Extension states | BA | 06.11.2019 | ME | 06.11.2019 | Title | German: | ÖFFENTLICH ZUGÄNGLICHER STÄDTISCHER STRANDUNTERHALTUNGSKOMPLEX MIT EINER KÜNSTLICH ANGELEGTEN TROPISCHEN LAGUNE ALS HERZSTÜCK UND VERFAHREN ZUR EFFIZIENTEN NUTZUNG VON BEGRENZT NUTZBAREN FLÄCHEN | [2020/04] | English: | A PUBLICLY ACCESSIBLE URBAN BEACH ENTERTAINMENT COMPLEX WITH A CENTERPIECE MAN-MADE TROPICAL-STYLE LAGOON AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING EFFICIENT UTILIZATION OF LIMITED USE LAND | [2020/04] | French: | COMPLEXE DE DIVERTISSEMENT DE PLAGE URBAINE ACCESSIBLE AU PUBLIC DOTÉ D'UN LAGON CENTRAL ARTIFICIEL DE STYLE TROPICAL ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT UNE UTILISATION EFFICACE DE TERRAINS À USAGE LIMITÉ | [2020/04] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 15.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/04] | 20.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.11.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | Appeal following examination | 02.01.2023 | Appeal received No. T0758/23 | 02.01.2023 | Payment of appeal fee | 03.03.2023 | Statement of grounds filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | Date: | 06.02.2023 | [2023/17] | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP2746227 (CRYSTAL LAGOONS CURAÇAO B V); | [I]EP3147015 (CRYSTAL LAGOONS (CURAÇAO) B V [CW]); | International search | [A]US2012255113 (OSTERMAN ROSS ALAN [US], et al); | [A]US2013074254 (PAYNE STEVEN [US], et al); | [A]US2015125212 (FISCHMANN FERNANDO BENJAMIN [CL]) |