EP3746809 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR VIRTUAL APERATURE RADAR TRACKING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oculii Corp 829 Space Dr. Beavercreek, OH 45434 / US | [2024/35] |
Former [2020/50] | For all designated states Oculii Corp 830 A Space Dr. Beavercreek, OH 45434 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HONG, Lang 830 A Space Dr. Beavercreek, OH 45434 / US | 02 /
HONG, Steven 830 A Space Dr. Beavercreek, OH 45434 / US | [2020/50] | Representative(s) | Dondi, Silvia, et al Bugnion S.p.A. Largo Michele Novaro, 1/A 43121 Parma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2020/50] | Higgs, Jonathan Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Altius House 1 North Fourth Street Milton Keynes MK9 1DG / GB | Application number, filing date | 18903470.5 | 30.01.2018 | [2020/50] | WO2018US15873 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019151979 | Date: | 08.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3746809 | Date: | 09.12.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.08.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/90, G01S13/00, F41G7/28, G01S13/72 | [2021/39] | CPC: |
G01S13/003 (EP,KR,US);
G01S13/4463 (KR,US);
G01S13/66 (EP,KR,US);
G01S13/72 (EP);
G01S13/723 (EP,KR,US);
G01S13/86 (EP,KR,US);
G01S13/90 (EP,KR,US);
G01S13/931 (EP,KR,US);
G01S13/934 (KR);
G01S15/66 (EP,KR,US);
G01S7/42 (KR,US);
G01S7/52019 (KR,US);
G01S7/52023 (KR,US);
G01S2013/0263 (EP,KR,US);
G01S2013/9316 (EP,KR,US);
G01S2013/932 (EP,KR,US);
G01S2013/9322 (EP,KR,US);
G01S2013/9323 (EP,KR,US);
G01S2013/9324 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/50] | G01S13/90, G01S13/00, F41G7/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/50] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR RADARVERFOLGUNG MIT VIRTUELLER APERTUR | [2020/50] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR VIRTUAL APERATURE RADAR TRACKING | [2020/50] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE POURSUITE AU RADAR À BALAYAGE ÉLECTRONIQUE À OUVERTURE VIRTUELLE | [2020/50] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2020 | Search fee paid | 12.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/50] | 03.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2023 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   27.03.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2014197984 (WANG JIAN [CA], et al) [X] 1,3,6-8,10,14 * figures 2A-C, 3A-C,4 * * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] - [0010] - [0015] , [0016] , [0018] , [0024] , [0038] , [0039] , [0042] , [0045] - [0048] * [Y] 11-13 [I] 2,4,5,9,15; | [YA]JP2016217976 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 11-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] , [0011] , [0024] - [0026] * [A] 1; | [A]US9869762 (ALLAND STEPHEN W [US], et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]US2018024235 (HONG LANG [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0018] , [0020] , [0060] * | International search | [A]US7535409 (CHOE JOON Y [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * ; entire document, *; | [A]US2009174590 (HUIZING ALBERT GEZINUS [NL], et al) [A] 1-20 * ; entire document, *; | [A]US2012268309 (SAMUEL ALPHONSO A [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * ; entire document, especially, abstract, FIG.1-3, para [0032], [0037], [0038]. [0040] *; | [A]US2013300596 (SHIRAKAWA KAZUO [JP]) [A] 1-20 * ; entire document, especially, abstract, FIG.1, para [0004], [0008], [0054], [0059] *; | [A]US2015102954 (HONG LANG [US]) [A] 1-20 * ; entire document, *; | [A] - LI Li et al., "Target Tracking in Uncertain Multipath Environment using Distributed Angle-of-Arrival Observation", 2015 IEEE Radar Conference (RadarCon), (20180404), pages 1473 - 1478, XP032788570 [A] 1-20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/RADAR.2015.7131228 | by applicant | US2014197984 | JP2016217979 | US9869762 | US2018024235 |