EP3584048 - PRESSING FORCE SWITCHING MECHANISM FOR ROTATION FEEDING PART OF PULVERIZER, PULVERIZER PROVIDED WITH SAME, AND PRESSING FORCE SWITCHING METHOD FOR ROTATION FEEDING PART OF PULVERIZER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.10.2022 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ohashi Inc. 401, Sakimura Chiyoda-cho Kanzaki-shi, Saga 842-0065 / JP | [2019/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIHARA Shinichi c/o Ohashi Inc., 401, Sakimura, Chiyoda-cho Kanzaki-shi, Saga 8420065 / JP | [2019/52] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/52] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18905648.4 | 09.02.2018 | [2019/52] | WO2018JP04718 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019155634 | Date: | 15.08.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3584048 | Date: | 25.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.08.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B27L11/00, B27L11/02, B02C18/06 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
B27L11/002 (EP);
B02C18/2283 (EP);
B27L11/00 (EP);
B27L11/02 (EP);
B02C18/14 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2019/52] | B27L11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/52] | Title | German: | DRUCKKRAFTSCHALTMECHANISMUS FÜR DEN ROTATIONSZUFÜHRTEIL EINES PULVERISATORS, PULVERISATORS DAMIT UND DRUCKKRAFTSCHALTVERFAHREN FÜR DEN ROTATIONSZUFÜHRTEIL EINES PULVERISATORS | [2019/52] | English: | PRESSING FORCE SWITCHING MECHANISM FOR ROTATION FEEDING PART OF PULVERIZER, PULVERIZER PROVIDED WITH SAME, AND PRESSING FORCE SWITCHING METHOD FOR ROTATION FEEDING PART OF PULVERIZER | [2019/52] | French: | MÉCANISME DE COMMUTATION DE FORCE DE PRESSION DESTINÉ À UNE PARTIE D'ALIMENTATION EN ROTATION D'UN PULVÉRISATEUR, PULVÉRISATEUR DOTÉ DUDIT MÉCANISME ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUTATION DE FORCE DE PRESSION DESTINÉ À UNE PARTIE D'ALIMENTATION EN ROTATION D'UN PULVÉRISATEUR | [2019/52] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.2019 | Translation filed | 16.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.2019 | Search fee paid | 16.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.2019 | Examination requested [2019/52] | 16.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3000411 (PIERRE EALET) [X] 1-7 * column 1, line 11 - line 18 * * column 5, lines 40-45, 62-66, 72-74 ** figures 3, 11, 12 * | International search | [A]JP2009184328 (OHASHI HIROYUKI) [A] 1-7 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JPS5539897U (YAMAMOTO, Shota) [A] 1-7 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JPS5683005U (KARUI) [A] 1-7 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JPS6446205U (YAMAMOTO MFG) [A] 1-7 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JPS6366457U (YAMAMOTO MFG) [A] 1-7 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JPS6355840U (YAMAMOTO MFG) [A] 1-7 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]US5060873 (STRONG DONALD E [US]) [A] 1-7 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) * | by applicant | JP2014058044 |