EP3752568 - WATER-BASED POLYMER DISPERSIONS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.11.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wacker Chemie AG Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | [2020/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Lingyun c/o Wacker Chemicals (China) Co., Ltd. Building 3, 1535 Hongmei Rd Caohejing Hi-Tech Park Shanghai 200233 / CN | 02 /
LI, Yun c/o Wacker Chemicals (China) Co., Ltd. Building 3, 1535 Hongmei Rd Caohejing Hi-Tech Park Shanghai 200233 / CN | 03 /
ZHANG, Jiyang c/o Wacker Chemicals (China) Co., Ltd. Building 3, 1535 Hongmei Rd Caohejing Hi-Tech Park Shanghai 200233 / CN | 04 /
SUN, Haoqing c/o Wacker Chemicals (China) Co., Ltd. Building 3, 1535 Hongmei Rd Caohejing Hi-Tech Park Shanghai 200233 / CN | 05 /
ZHENG, Jin c/o Wacker Chemicals (China) Co., Ltd. Building 3, 1535 Hongmei Rd Caohejing Hi-Tech Park Shanghai 200233 / CN | [2020/52] | Representative(s) | Ege, Markus, et al Wacker Chemie AG Gisela-Stein-Straße 1 81671 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/52] | Ege, Markus, et al Wacker Chemie AG Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18906057.7 | 13.02.2018 | [2020/52] | WO2018CN76615 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019157620 | Date: | 22.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3752568 | Date: | 23.12.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 22.08.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C09D129/04, C08F218/00, C08F218/04, C04B40/00 | [2021/37] | CPC: |
C08L31/04 (EP);
C08F220/285 (US);
C04B24/2623 (US);
C04B24/2647 (US);
C04B24/2652 (US);
C04B28/04 (EP);
C04B40/0039 (EP,US);
C08L29/04 (US);
C08L33/14 (US);
C08L33/26 (US);
C08L71/02 (US);
C04B2111/00094 (EP);
C08L2201/50 (US);
C08L2201/54 (US);
C08L2205/025 (EP);
C08L2205/035 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C04B28/04, C04B14/06, C04B14/28, C04B24/2623, C04B24/2623, C04B24/2647, C04B24/2652, C04B2103/406, C04B2103/50 (EP);
C04B40/0039, C04B24/2623, C04B24/2623, C04B24/2623, C04B24/2652, C04B2103/406, C04B2103/50 (EP);
C04B40/0039, C04B24/2623, C04B24/2623, C04B24/2652, C04B24/32 (EP);
C08L31/04, C08L29/04, C08L29/04, C08L29/04, C08L33/26, C08L71/02 (EP); |
Former IPC [2020/52] | C09D129/04, C08F218/00, C08F218/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/52] | Title | German: | WASSERBASIERT POLYMERDISPERSIONEN UND DEREN VERWENDUNGEN | [2020/52] | English: | WATER-BASED POLYMER DISPERSIONS AND USES THEREOF | [2020/52] | French: | DISPERSIONS DE POLYMÈRE À BASE D'EAU ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2020/52] | Entry into regional phase | 29.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.2020 | Search fee paid | 29.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CN | 29.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/52] | 02.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2024 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6359040 (BURDICK CHARLES L [US]) [A] 1-15* abstract, claims 1-29 *; | [Y]US2015184015 (MCLENNAN ALISTAIR [DE], et al) [Y] 1-15 * description, paragraphs [0013], [0019], [0023]-[0026], [0031]-[0032], [0045], [0052] *; | [Y]CN106634350 (ZHEJIANG DELFT NEW BUILDING MAT CO LTD) [Y] 1-15 * description, paragraph [0015] * |