EP3757561 - AUTOMATED ANALYZER AND AUTOMATIC ANALYSIS METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi High-Tech Corporation 17-1, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-6409 / JP | [2021/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKEUCHI, Miwa c/o Hitachi High-Tech Corporation 24-14, Nishi Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8717 / JP | 02 /
USHIKU, Emiko c/o Hitachi High-Tech Corporation 24-14, Nishi Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8717 / JP | 03 /
TAKAHASHI, Kenichi c/o Hitachi High-Tech Corporation 24-14, Nishi Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8717 / JP | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2021/01] | Application number, filing date | 18906758.0 | 21.12.2018 | [2021/01] | WO2018JP47389 | Priority number, date | JP20180030892 | 23.02.2018 Original published format: JP 2018030892 | [2021/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019163281 | Date: | 29.08.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3757561 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.08.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/333, G01N27/416 | [2021/46] | CPC: |
G01N27/4163 (EP,US);
G01N27/333 (EP,US);
G01N33/84 (US)
|
Former IPC [2021/01] | G01N27/26, G01N27/416, G01N33/84 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISIERTER ANALYSATOR UND AUTOMATISCHES ANALYSEVERFAHREN | [2021/01] | English: | AUTOMATED ANALYZER AND AUTOMATIC ANALYSIS METHOD | [2021/01] | French: | ANALYSEUR AUTOMATISÉ ET PROCÉDÉ D'ANALYSE AUTOMATIQUE | [2021/01] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2020 | Translation filed | 23.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 23.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 23.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/53] | 28.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JPH07167818 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]EP0667522 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]); | [XAY]JPH07253409 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [Y]JP2002228629 (HORIBA LTD); | [A]WO2017059037 (SIEMENS HEALTHCARE DIAGNOSTICS INC [US]) | International search | [A]JPS61195343 (SHIMADZU CORP) [A] 2-9 * , *; | [Y]JPH07167818 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 1, 10-13 * , [0007] - [0010], [0020], [0032], [0039] *; | [Y]JPH07325063 (SHIMADZU CORP) [Y] 11-12 * , [0007] *; | [Y]JP2002228629 (HORIBA LTD) [Y] 1, 10-13 * [0005] - [0010], [0019], [0032], 1-3 *; | [A]JP2012058117 (JOOKOO CO LTD) [A] 2-9* , *; | [Y]WO2015008517 (HITACHI HIGH TECH CORP [JP]) [Y] 11-12 * , [0035] & US 2016/0131611 A1, [0044] & EP 3023776 A1 & CN 105378466 A *; | [Y]JP2017146307 (TOKYO METROPOLITAN GOV, et al) [Y] 1, 10-13 * , [0027] - [0030], 2 & US 2017/0234826 A1, [0050] - [0053], 2 & DE 102017202367 A1 * | by applicant | JPH07167818 |