EP3698709 - ELECTROCARDIOGRAM INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD AND ELECTROCARDIOGRAM WORKSTATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shanghai Lepu CloudMed Co., LTD Room1601,1602,1603,1604 NO.668 Xinzhuan Road,Xinqiao Town Songjiang District, Shanghai / CN | [2021/50] |
Former [2020/44] | For all designated states SHANGHAI YOCALY HEALTH MANAGEMENT CO., LTD. 16F Block A, No. 668 Xinzhuan Road Songjiang District Shanghai 201612 / CN | ||
Former [2020/35] | For all designated states Lepu Medical Technology (Beijing) Co., Ltd. 3 No. 37 Chaoqian Road Changping Tech. Zone Changping District Beijing 102200 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAO, Jun No.3 Building, No.37 Chaoqian Rd., Changping District Beijing 102200 / CN | 02 /
HU, Chuanyan No.3 Building, No.37 Chaoqian Rd., Changping District Beijing 102200 / CN | 03 /
LIU, Tao No.3 Building, No.37 Chaoqian Rd., Changping District Beijing 102200 / CN | 04 /
JIANG, Yan No.3 Building, No.37 Chaoqian Rd., Changping District Beijing 102200 / CN | 05 /
TIAN, Liang No.37 Chaoqian Rd., Changping District Beijing 102200 / CN | 06 /
CAO, Huili No.3 Building, No.37 Chaoqian Rd., Changping District Beijing 102200 / CN | 07 /
LIU, Chang No.3 Building, No.37 Chaoqian Rd., Changping District Beijing 102200 / CN | [2020/35] | Representative(s) | Glück Kritzenberger Patentanwälte PartGmbB Franz-Mayer-Str. 16a 93053 Regensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/35] | Glück Kritzenberger Patentanwälte PartGmbB Hermann-Köhl-Strasse 2a 93049 Regensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 18907280.4 | 18.04.2018 | [2020/35] | WO2018CN83465 | Priority number, date | CN201810157158 | 24.02.2018 Original published format: CN201810157158 | [2020/35] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019161610 | Date: | 29.08.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3698709 | Date: | 26.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 29.08.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G16H15/00, A61B5/346, // G16H50/70 | [2021/33] | CPC: |
A61B5/7267 (EP,US);
A61B5/316 (US);
A61B5/0006 (EP,US);
A61B5/02405 (EP);
A61B5/0245 (EP);
A61B5/353 (EP);
A61B5/355 (EP);
A61B5/358 (EP);
A61B5/363 (EP,US);
A61B5/364 (EP,US);
A61B5/366 (US);
A61B5/7203 (EP,US);
A61B5/7221 (US);
A61B5/725 (EP);
A61B5/7282 (EP,US);
A61B5/742 (EP,US);
G16H15/00 (EP);
A61B2562/08 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/35] | A61B5/0402 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/35] | Title | German: | ELEKTROKARDIOGRAMM-INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND ELEKTROKARDIOGRAMM-ARBEITSPLATZSYSTEM | [2020/35] | English: | ELECTROCARDIOGRAM INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD AND ELECTROCARDIOGRAM WORKSTATION SYSTEM | [2020/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS D'ÉLECTROCARDIOGRAMME ET SYSTÈME DE POSTE DE TRAVAIL D'ÉLECTROCARDIOGRAMME | [2020/35] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2020 | Translation filed | 18.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2020 | Search fee paid | 18.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/35] | 18.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/12] | 22.11.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2023 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]CN106027566 (SHANGHAI SHUCHUANG MEDICAL TECH CO LTD) [I] 1-5,10-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0206] - paragraph [0239] * * figures 19,20 * [Y] 6-9; | [Y]CN107714023 (LEPU MED TECH BEIJING CO LTD) [Y] 6-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0105] ** figures 1-6 * | International search | [A]US2016045117 (LIU NEHEMIAH T [US], et al) [A] 1-13* entire document *; | [XY]CN106027566 (SHANGHAI SHUCHUANG MEDICAL TECH CO LTD) [X] 1-5, 10-13 * description, paragraphs [0048]-[0103], and figures 19-20 * * description, paragraphs [0048]-[0103], and figures 19-20 * [Y] 6, 9; | [A]CN107016248 (CHENGDU LANGRUI MEDICAL TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-13 * entire document *; | [Y]CN107714023 (LEPU MED TECH BEIJING CO LTD) [Y] 6, 9 * description, paragraphs [0042]-[0107], and figures 1-6 * |