EP3758984 - VEHICLE SEAT WITH AN ADJUSTABLE HEADREST AND INTEGRATED REAR SEAT AIRBAG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Autoliv ASP, Inc. 3350 Airport Road Ogden, UT 84405 / US | [2021/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHNEIDER, David W. 6321 Maybee Rd. Clarkston, MI 48346 / US | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2021/01] | Application number, filing date | 18907632.6 | 29.11.2018 | [2021/01] | WO2018US63030 | Priority number, date | US201815907454 | 28.02.2018 Original published format: US201815907454 | [2021/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019168575 | Date: | 06.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3758984 | Date: | 06.01.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3758984 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/809, B60N2/838, B60N2/894, B60N2/64, B60R21/207, B60R21/231 | [2021/47] | CPC: |
B60N2/809 (EP,KR,US);
B60R21/207 (EP,KR,US);
B60N2/42727 (KR,US);
B60N2/4279 (KR,US);
B60N2/64 (EP);
B60N2/838 (EP,KR,US);
B60N2/894 (EP,KR,US);
B60R21/013 (KR,US);
B60R21/231 (EP,KR,US);
B60R2021/2074 (KR,US);
B60R2021/2078 (EP,KR);
B60R2021/23153 (EP,KR,US);
B60R2021/23161 (KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/01] | B60R21/207, B60R21/16, B60N2/80 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGSITZ MIT VERSTELLBARER KOPFSTÜTZE UND INTEGRIERTEM RÜCKSITZAIRBAG | [2021/01] | English: | VEHICLE SEAT WITH AN ADJUSTABLE HEADREST AND INTEGRATED REAR SEAT AIRBAG | [2021/01] | French: | SIÈGE DE VÉHICULE AVEC APPUI-TÊTE RÉGLABLE ET COUSSIN DE SÉCURITÉ GONFLABLE DE SIÈGE ARRIÈRE INTÉGRÉ | [2021/01] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 22.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/01] | 13.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.09.2023 | CZ | 06.09.2023 | DK | 06.09.2023 | EE | 06.09.2023 | ES | 06.09.2023 | FI | 06.09.2023 | HR | 06.09.2023 | IT | 06.09.2023 | LT | 06.09.2023 | LV | 06.09.2023 | MC | 06.09.2023 | NL | 06.09.2023 | PL | 06.09.2023 | RO | 06.09.2023 | RS | 06.09.2023 | SE | 06.09.2023 | SI | 06.09.2023 | SK | 06.09.2023 | SM | 06.09.2023 | LU | 29.11.2023 | CH | 30.11.2023 | NO | 06.12.2023 | GR | 07.12.2023 | IS | 06.01.2024 | PT | 08.01.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
DK | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
MC | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
LU | 29.11.2023 | ||
CH | 30.11.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
DK | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
MC | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
MC | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 06.09.2023 | |
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]JPH10273000 (TACHI S CO) [X] 1,2,7,8 * figures 1, 2, 3 * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0019] * [A] 6 [Y] 10 [I] 3-5; | [XA]JP2010188767 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1,2,7-9 * figures 1, 2, 4, 5 * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0043] * [A] 6; | [Y]JP2016155532 (NHK SPRING CO LTD) [Y] 10 * figures 1, 2, 3 ** paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0020] * | International search | [Y]KR19980036608U (Kia Motors Corporation) [Y] 10 * , fig 1-3 *; | [Y]US7798570 (KWIECINSKI JOZEF [US], et al) [Y] 11 * , especially fig 7; col 4, In 16-19 *; | [XY]US2015091282 (NAGASAWA ISAMU [JP], et al) [X] 1-6, 8-9, 18-20 * , entire document, especially fig 1-3, 7; para [0097], [0099], [0101] * [Y] 10-11; | [A]US9586552 (WHITENS MICHAEL JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1-6, 8-11, 18-20* , entire document * | by applicant | JP2010188767 | US19460625006 |