EP3760372 - BALANCE AND OSCILLATION ADJUSTMENT SYSTEM FOR ROTARY TOOL, BALANCE AND OSCILLATION MEASUREMENT DEVICE, BALANCE AND OSCILLATION ADJUSTMENT METHOD, AND TOOL HOLDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Big Daishowa Co., Ltd. Nishi-Ishikiri-cho 3-6-20 Higashi-Osaka City, Osaka 579-8013 / JP | For all designated states Big Daishowa Seiki Co., Ltd. 3-39, Nishi-ishikiricho 3-chome Higashiosaka-shi, Osaka 579-8013 / JP | [2023/09] |
Former [2022/29] | For all designated states Big Daishowa Co., Ltd. Nishi-Ishikiri-cho 3-6-20 Higashi-Osaka City, Osaka, 579-8013 / JP | ||
For all designated states Big Daishowa Seiki Co., Ltd. 3-39, Nishi-ishikiricho 3-chome Higashiosaka-shi, Osaka 579-8013 / JP | |||
Former [2021/01] | For all designated states BIG DAISHOWA CO., LTD. 3-39, Nishi-ishikiricho 3-chome Higashiosaka-shi, Osaka 579-8013 / JP | ||
For all designated states Big Daishowa Seiki Co., Ltd. 3-39, Nishi-ishikiricho 3-chome Higashiosaka-shi, Osaka 579-8013 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAUCHI Masataka c/o BIG DAISHOWA SEIKI CO., LTD., 3-39, Nishi- ishikiricho 3-chome Higashiosaka-shi Osaka 579-8013 / JP | 02 /
UEMURA Kouichi c/o BIG DAISHOWA SEIKI CO., LTD., 3-39, Nishi- ishikiricho 3-chome Higashiosaka-shi Osaka 579-8013 / JP | 03 /
TSUJITA Yukio c/o BIG DAISHOWA SEIKI CO., LTD., 3-39, Nishi- ishikiricho 3-chome Higashiosaka-shi Osaka 579-8013 / JP | 04 /
OOHASHI Reina c/o BIG DAISHOWA SEIKI CO., LTD., 3-39, Nishi- ishikiricho 3-chome Higashiosaka-shi Osaka 579-8013 / JP | 05 /
KUMASAKI Shunsuke c/o BIG DAISHOWA SEIKI CO., LTD., 3-39, Nishi- ishikiricho 3-chome Higashiosaka-shi Osaka 579-8013 / JP | 06 /
FUNASHOKU Akihito c/o BIG DAISHOWA SEIKI CO., LTD., 3-39, Nishi- ishikiricho 3-chome Higashiosaka-shi Osaka 579-8013 / JP | [2022/39] |
Former [2021/01] | 01 /
YAUCHI Masataka c/o BIG DAISHOWA SEIKI CO., LTD., 3-39, Nishi- ishikiricho 3-chome Higashiosaka-shi Osaka 579-8013 / JP | ||
02 /
UEMURA Kouichi c/o BIG DAISHOWA SEIKI CO., LTD., 3-39, Nishi- ishikiricho 3-chome Higashiosaka-shi Osaka 579-8013 / JP | |||
03 /
TSUJITA Yukio c/o BIG DAISHOWA SEIKI CO., LTD., 3-39, Nishi- ishikiricho 3-chome Higashiosaka-shi Osaka 579-8013 / JP | |||
04 /
OOHASHI Reina c/o BIG DAISHOWA SEIKI CO., LTD., 3-39, Nishi- ishikiricho 3-chome Higashiosaka-shi Osaka 579-8013 / JP | |||
05 /
KUMASAKI Shunsuke c/o BIG DAISHOWA CO., LTD., 3-39, Nishi- ishikiricho 3-chome Higashiosaka-shi Osaka 579-8013 / JP | |||
06 /
FUNASHOKU Akihito c/o BIG DAISHOWA SEIKI CO., LTD., 3-39, Nishi- ishikiricho 3-chome Higashiosaka-shi Osaka 579-8013 / JP | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/01] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 18908153.2 | 02.03.2018 | [2021/01] | WO2018JP07941 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019167242 | Date: | 06.09.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3760372 | Date: | 06.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/404, B23Q11/00, B23Q3/12, B23Q17/00, G05B19/4065 | [2022/10] | CPC: |
G05B19/404 (EP,KR,US);
B23Q11/0035 (EP,KR,US);
B23Q17/22 (KR,US);
B23Q17/2409 (KR,US);
B23Q17/2457 (US);
G01M1/00 (US);
G01M1/30 (US);
G01M1/32 (US);
G01M1/36 (US);
G05B19/4065 (EP,KR,US);
B23B2250/04 (EP);
B23B2260/022 (EP);
B23Q2017/001 (EP,KR,US);
B23Q2717/00 (US);
G05B2219/37234 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/01] | B23Q11/00, B23Q3/12, B23Q17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] | Title | German: | AUSGLEICHS- UND OSZILLATIONSEINSTELLSYSTEM FÜR ROTATIONSINSTRUMENT, WAAGE UND OSZILLATIONSMESSVORRICHTUNG, AUSGLEICHS- UND OSZILLATIONSEINSTELLVERFAHREN, UND WERKZEUGHALTER | [2021/01] | English: | BALANCE AND OSCILLATION ADJUSTMENT SYSTEM FOR ROTARY TOOL, BALANCE AND OSCILLATION MEASUREMENT DEVICE, BALANCE AND OSCILLATION ADJUSTMENT METHOD, AND TOOL HOLDER | [2021/01] | French: | SYSTÈME DE RÉGLAGE D'ÉQUILIBRE ET D'OSCILLATION POUR OUTIL ROTATIF, DISPOSITIF DE MESURE D'ÉQUILIBRE ET D'OSCILLATION, PROCÉDÉ DE RÉGLAGE D'ÉQUILIBRE ET D'OSCILLATION, ET PORTE-OUTIL | [2021/01] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2020 | Translation filed | 01.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 01.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.12.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 01.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/01] | 22.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | EP22192193.5 / EP4116783 | EP22192195.0 / EP4116785 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2004009244 (NIKKEN KOSAKUSHO WORKS LTD); | International search | [A]JPH03107576 (GEN MOTORS CORP); | [A]US6053678 (D ANDREA ERMANNO [IT]); | [Y]JP2001138162 (NT TOOL KK); | [Y]JP2003089030 (RICOH KK); | [Y]JP2004009244 (NIKKEN KOSAKUSHO WORKS LTD); | [A]JP2011194500 (NIKKEN KOSAKUSHO WORKS LTD); | [A]JP2013103281 (KYORITSU SEIKI CORP); | [Y]JP2013129011 (TOSHIBA MACHINE CO LTD) | by applicant | JPH0387539U | US5286042 |