EP3764566 - DETECTION METHOD AND DEVICE FOR HIGH-DYNAMIC-RANGE OPTICAL TIME DOMAIN REFLECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Accelink Technologies Co., Ltd. 1 Tanhu Road Canglongdao Development Zone Jiangxia District Wuhan, Hubei 430205 / CN | [2021/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHOU, Qi 1 Tanhu Road, Canglongdao Development Zone, Jiangxia District Wuhan, Hubei 430205 / CN | 02 /
BU, Qinlian 1 Tanhu Road, Canglongdao Development Zone, Jiangxia District Wuhan, Hubei 430205 / CN | 03 /
XIONG, Tao 1 Tanhu Road, Canglongdao Development Zone, Jiangxia District Wuhan, Hubei 430205 / CN | 04 /
FU, Chengpeng 1 Tanhu Road, Canglongdao Development Zone, Jiangxia District Wuhan, Hubei 430205 / CN | 05 /
ZHANG, Jiantao 1 Tanhu Road, Canglongdao Development Zone, Jiangxia District Wuhan, Hubei 430205 / CN | 06 /
YU, Chunping 1 Tanhu Road, Canglongdao Development Zone, Jiangxia District Wuhan, Hubei 430205 / CN | 07 /
LE, Menghui 1 Tanhu Road, Canglongdao Development Zone, Jiangxia District Wuhan, Hubei 430205 / CN | [2021/02] | Representative(s) | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/02] | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18908330.6 | 25.12.2018 | [2021/02] | WO2018CN123408 | Priority number, date | CN201810191046 | 08.03.2018 Original published format: CN201810191046 | [2021/02] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019169934 | Date: | 12.09.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3764566 | Date: | 13.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 12.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/071, H01S3/30, G01M11/00 | [2021/50] | CPC: |
H04B10/071 (EP,CN);
G01M11/3127 (EP);
G01M11/319 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/02] | H04B10/071, H01S3/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/02] | Title | German: | DETEKTIONSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG FÜR OPTISCHE ZEITBEREICHSREFLEXION MIT HOHEM DYNAMIKBEREICH | [2021/02] | English: | DETECTION METHOD AND DEVICE FOR HIGH-DYNAMIC-RANGE OPTICAL TIME DOMAIN REFLECTION | [2021/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION POUR RÉFLEXION DE DOMAINE TEMPOREL OPTIQUE À PLAGE DYNAMIQUE ÉLEVÉE | [2021/02] | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.2020 | Translation filed | 30.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 30.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/02] | 20.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2015253217 (GURUSAMI ARAVANAN [US], et al); | [A]CN106452569 (WUXI TACLINK OPTOELECTRONICS TECH CO LTD); | [XP]CN108199767 (ACCELINK TECH CO LTD) |