EP3763918 - SHROUD MOUNTING STRUCTURE FOR GAS TURBINE, SHROUD ASSEMBLY, AND SHROUD ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kawasaki Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1 Higashikawasaki-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 650-8670 / JP | [2021/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUSUMOTO, Yoshiaki c/o Kawasaki Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1 Higashikawasaki-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 650-8670 / JP | [2021/02] | Representative(s) | Dantz, Jan Henning, et al Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [2021/02] | Application number, filing date | 18908925.3 | 07.03.2018 | [2021/02] | WO2018JP08781 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019171495 | Date: | 12.09.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3763918 | Date: | 13.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F01D11/08, F01D25/00, F01D25/12, F01D25/24, F01D11/16, F01D11/18, F01D11/22, F01D11/24, F01D9/04 | [2021/42] | CPC: |
F01D25/005 (EP);
F01D25/246 (US);
F01D11/08 (EP,US);
F01D11/16 (EP);
F01D11/18 (EP);
F01D11/22 (EP);
F01D11/24 (EP);
F01D25/12 (EP);
F01D25/24 (EP);
F01D9/04 (EP);
F01D11/005 (US);
F05D2220/323 (US);
F05D2240/11 (EP,US);
F05D2240/55 (EP);
F05D2240/59 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/02] | F01D11/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/02] | Title | German: | DECKBANDMONTAGESTRUKTUR FÜR GASTURBINE, DECKBANDANORDNUNG UND DECKBANDELEMENT | [2021/02] | English: | SHROUD MOUNTING STRUCTURE FOR GAS TURBINE, SHROUD ASSEMBLY, AND SHROUD ELEMENT | [2021/02] | French: | STRUCTURE DE MONTAGE DE CARÉNAGE POUR TURBINE À GAZ, ENSEMBLE CARÉNAGE ET ÉLÉMENT DE CARÉNAGE | [2021/02] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2020 | Translation filed | 05.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 05.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/02] | 24.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2009052553 (GEN ELECTRIC); | [XYI]US2010150703 (GONZALEZ MALBERTO F [US], et al) | International search | [YA]JP2004500526 [Y] 1, 3-5, 13, 18-19 * , * [A] 2, 6-12 , 14-17; | [XYA]US2008107521 (MORRISON JAY A [US], et al) [X] 1, 3-5, 13, 18-19 * , FIGS. * [Y] 2, 6-12 , 14-17 [A] ; | [YA]JP2010159755 (GEN ELECTRIC) [Y] 1, 3-5, 13, 18-19 [A] 2, 6-12 , 14-17, 19; | [A]US2014127457 (HILLIER STEVEN [GB])[A] 1-19 | by applicant | JP2009052553 | JP2016133117 |