EP3764338 - VEHICLE BEHAVIOR PREDICTION METHOD AND VEHICLE BEHAVIOR PREDICTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.01.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2 Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | For all designated states Renault s.a.s 122-122 bis avenue du Général Leclerc 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [2022/30] |
Former [2022/09] | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2 Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | ||
For all designated states Renault s.a.s 13/15, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | |||
Former [2021/02] | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2 Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | ||
For all designated states RENAULT S.A.S. 13-15 Quai Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAGUCHI, Shotaro c/o Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Department 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243--0123 / JP | 02 /
FANG, Fang c/o Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. Intellectulal Property Department 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243--0123 / JP | [2021/02] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2021/02] | Application number, filing date | 18909093.9 | 09.03.2018 | [2021/02] | WO2018IB00325 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019171097 | Date: | 12.09.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3764338 | Date: | 13.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/16, G08G1/0962, H04W4/44, H04W4/48 | [2021/13] | CPC: |
G08G1/166 (EP);
G08G1/16 (RU);
B60W60/0017 (US);
B60W60/0027 (US);
G08G1/09623 (EP);
G08G1/09626 (EP);
G08G1/162 (EP);
H04W4/40 (EP);
B60W2552/50 (US);
B60W2554/404 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/02] | G08G1/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/02] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VORHERSAGE DES FAHRZEUGVERHALTENS UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VORHERSAGE DES FAHRZEUGVERHALTENS | [2021/02] | English: | VEHICLE BEHAVIOR PREDICTION METHOD AND VEHICLE BEHAVIOR PREDICTION DEVICE | [2021/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉDICTION DE COMPORTEMENT DE VÉHICULE ET DISPOSITIF DE PRÉDICTION DE COMPORTEMENT DE VÉHICULE | [2021/02] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2020 | Translation filed | 01.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 01.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.11.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 01.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/02] | 16.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]JP2010003157 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0 24] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0064] * [Y] 10 [I] 2-9,11-14; | [YDA]JP2016143137 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD) [YD] 10 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0025] *[A] 1,3,5; | [A]US9495874 (ZHU JIAJUN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 2, line 39 - line 58 * * column 4, line 17 - line 30 * * column 5, line 25 - column 7, line 27 * * column 8, line 10 - line 59 * * column 11, line 50 - line 64 * * column 17, line 20 - line 48 * | International search | [A]JP2010281746 (CLARION CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * , *; | [Y]WO2011055823 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1, 3, 5, 15 * , *; | [A]WO2016002276 (ADC TECHNOLOGY INC [JP]) [A] 1-15* , *; | [YA]JP2016143137 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD) [Y] 1, 3, 5, 15 * , * [A] 2, 4, 6-14 | by applicant | JP2016143137 |