EP3768008 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR INDICATING AND SEARCHING FOR POSITION OF SYNCHRONOUS BROADCAST BLOCK OF DEFINED CELL, AND BASE STATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co., Ltd. No. 018, Floor 8, Building 6, Yard 33 Middle Xierqi Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2023/32] |
Former [2021/03] | For all designated states Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co., Ltd. No. 018, floor 8, building 6, yard 33 Middle Xierqi Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Yang No.018, Floor 8, Building 6, Yard 33 Middle Xierqi Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2021/03] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2021/03] | Application number, filing date | 18909930.2 | 28.03.2018 | [2021/03] | WO2018CN80967 | Priority number, date | WO2018CN79331 | 16.03.2018 Original published format: PCT/CN2018/079331 | [2021/19] |
Former [2021/03] | WO2018CN80967 | 16.03.2018 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019174069 | Date: | 19.09.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3768008 | Date: | 20.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3768008 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 19.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/12, // H04W56/00 | [2023/11] | CPC: |
H04W48/12 (EP);
H04W48/10 (US);
H04J11/0073 (US);
H04J11/0076 (US);
H04J11/0086 (US);
H04W56/001 (US);
H04W56/00 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/20] | H04W72/04, H04L5/00, H04W56/00 | ||
Former IPC [2021/03] | H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ANZEIGE UND SUCHE NACH DER POSITION EINES SYNCHRONEN RUNDFUNKBLOCKS EINER DEFINIERTEN ZELLE UND BASISSTATION | [2021/03] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR INDICATING AND SEARCHING FOR POSITION OF SYNCHRONOUS BROADCAST BLOCK OF DEFINED CELL, AND BASE STATION | [2021/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'INDICATION ET DE RECHERCHE DE POSITION DE BLOC DE DIFFUSION SYNCHRONE DE CELLULE DÉFINIE, ET STATION DE BASE | [2021/03] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2020 | Translation filed | 15.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 15.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/03] | 12.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.08.2023 | CZ | 09.08.2023 | DK | 09.08.2023 | EE | 09.08.2023 | FI | 09.08.2023 | HR | 09.08.2023 | IT | 09.08.2023 | LT | 09.08.2023 | LV | 09.08.2023 | PL | 09.08.2023 | RO | 09.08.2023 | RS | 09.08.2023 | SE | 09.08.2023 | SI | 09.08.2023 | SK | 09.08.2023 | SM | 09.08.2023 | NO | 09.11.2023 | GR | 10.11.2023 | IS | 09.12.2023 | PT | 11.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
IT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 09.08.2023 | |
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "Remaining details on NR-PBCH", vol. RAN WG1, no. Prague; 20171009 - 20171013, (20171008), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1718527 REMAINING DETAILS ON NR-PBCH, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20171008), XP051341709 [X] 1-15 * page 4, paragraph 5. Remaining information in PBCH payload - page 5 * * table 2 * | [A] - LG ELECTRONICS, "Remaining Details on Synchronization signal", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1800349, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20180126), pages 1 - 7, XP051384805 [A] 1-15 * page 2, paragraph 2 - page 3, paragraph 1 * * paragraph [Observation 2] * * paragraph [Proposal 2] * | International search | [A]WO2017004774 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-26 * entire document *; | [A]US2017094624 (BALACHANDRAN KUMAR [US], et al) [A] 1-26* entire document *; | [A]CN106793058 (SPREADTRUM COMM SHANGHAI CO ) [A] 1-26 * entire document *; | [A] - LG Electronics, "Remaining Details on Synchronization Signal", 3GPP Draft; R1-1800349 , Vancouver, Canada, (20180126), pages 1 - 7, XP051384805 [A] 1-26 * , section 2 * | [A] - MediaTek Inc, "SS Block Transmissions in Wideband Carrier", 3GPP Draft; R1-1719556, Reno, USA, (20171201), pages 1 - 3, XP051369370 [A] 1-26 * , entire document * | [A] - OPPO, "Remaining Details on SS Block Transmissions", 3GPP Draft; R1-1720853, Reno, USA, (20171101), pages 1 - 3, XP051369092 [A] 1-26 * , entire document * |