EP3767160 - SIMULATED FLAME DEVICE USING MAGNETIC SUSPENSION, AND SIMULATED FLAME LAMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hu, Wei Room 405, Block A, 3-Phase, Jia-zhaoye City Square Bantian Street, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | For all designated states Li, Chao Room 2506, Block A, No.3 Building No. 2-House, 3-Phase Jia-zhaoye City Square, Banxuegang Avenue Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2021/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2021/03] | Representative(s) | Meyer, Thorsten Meyer Patentanwaltskanzlei Pfarrer-Schultes-Weg 14 89077 Ulm / DE | [2021/03] | Application number, filing date | 18910027.4 | 28.06.2018 | [2021/03] | WO2018CN93243 | Priority number, date | CN201810220664 | 16.03.2018 Original published format: CN201810220664 | [2021/03] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019174154 | Date: | 19.09.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3767160 | Date: | 20.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 19.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F21S10/04, F21V14/00, F21Y101/00, F21S6/00 | [2021/46] | CPC: |
F21S10/046 (EP,US);
F21S10/04 (CN);
F21S6/001 (EP);
F21V21/096 (CN);
F21V23/04 (CN);
H02N15/00 (US);
F21W2121/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/03] | F21S10/04, F21V14/00, F21Y101/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/03] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG FÜR SIMULIERTE FLAMMEN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON MAGNETISCHER SUSPENSION UND LAMPE MIT SIMULIERTEN FLAMMEN | [2021/03] | English: | SIMULATED FLAME DEVICE USING MAGNETIC SUSPENSION, AND SIMULATED FLAME LAMP | [2021/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FLAMME SIMULÉE AU MOYEN D'UNE SUSPENSION MAGNÉTIQUE, ET LAMPE À FLAMME SIMULÉE | [2021/03] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2020 | Translation filed | 08.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 08.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/03] | 14.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 28.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2023 | 06   M06   Not yet paid | 30.06.2024 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]CN203349145U (WU SHANGQIANG) [X] 1,2,7,8,10 * the whole document * [I] 3,4,6,9; | [X]WO2015021066 (LUMINARA WORDWIDE LLC [US]) [X] 1,2,7,10 * paragraph [0105]; figures 30A-30D *; | [I]CN205619160U (PAN YAN) [I] 1,7,10* the whole document *; | [XI]CN207049777U (PAN YAN, et al) [X] 1,2,4,7,10 * the whole document * [I] 3,5,6 | International search | [X]CN102721002 (XIAOFENG LI) [X] 1-10 * description, paragraphs 33-44, and figures 1-6 *; | [A]CN104534396 (FOSHAN TOPDAY OPTOELECTRONICS TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * entire document *; | [A]CN204300960U (DONGGUAN DAXIN ORNAMENTAL GIFT CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * entire document *; | [A]CN204678247U (DONGGUAN DAXIN ORNAMENTAL GIFT CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * entire document *; | [A]FR3025864 (LAI WEN-CHENG [TW]) [A] 1-10* entire document *; | [A]CN206989088U (HUANG GUOZENG) [A] 1-10 * entire document * |