EP3687055 - POWER CONVERSION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.05.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PL, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOSHIBA MITSUBISHI-ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL SYSTEMS CORPORATION 3-1-1, Kyobashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0031 / JP | [2023/48] |
Former [2020/31] | For all designated states Toshiba Mitsubishi-Electric Industrial Systems Corporation 3-1-1 Kyobashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0031 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOBAYASHI, Shunsuke c/o TOSHIBA MITSUBISHI-ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL SYSTEMS CORPORATION 3-1-1 Kyobashi, Chuo-ku Tokyo 1040031 / JP | [2020/31] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [2023/51] |
Former [2020/31] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 18910235.3 | 20.11.2018 | [2020/31] | WO2018JP42839 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020105121 | Date: | 28.05.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3687055 | Date: | 29.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3687055 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/42, H02M1/32, H02M7/49 | [2023/28] | CPC: |
H02M1/32 (EP);
H02M7/487 (US);
G01R31/42 (EP,US);
H02M7/49 (EP);
H02P27/06 (US);
H04Q9/00 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/45] | H02M7/49, H02M1/32, G01R31/00 | ||
Former IPC [2020/31] | H02M7/49 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENERGIEWANDLERVORRICHTUNG | [2023/48] | English: | POWER CONVERSION DEVICE | [2020/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CONVERSION DE PUISSANCE | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/31] | STROMUMWANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2019 | Translation filed | 24.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2019 | Search fee paid | 24.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/31] | 20.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.06.2023 | 22.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 20.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.12.2023 | CZ | 20.12.2023 | EE | 20.12.2023 | ES | 20.12.2023 | FI | 20.12.2023 | HR | 20.12.2023 | IT | 20.12.2023 | LT | 20.12.2023 | LV | 20.12.2023 | NL | 20.12.2023 | PL | 20.12.2023 | RO | 20.12.2023 | RS | 20.12.2023 | SE | 20.12.2023 | SK | 20.12.2023 | SM | 20.12.2023 | BG | 20.03.2024 | NO | 20.03.2024 | GR | 21.03.2024 | IS | 20.04.2024 | PT | 22.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 20.12.2023 | |
CZ | 20.12.2023 | ||
EE | 20.12.2023 | ||
ES | 20.12.2023 | ||
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RO | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 20.12.2023 | |
ES | 20.12.2023 | ||
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | FI | 20.12.2023 | |
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 21.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2015234714 (TSUCHIDA TOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,10,11 * figure 6 * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0095] - paragraph [0106] * * paragraph [0123] * [Y] 9,12,13 [I] 6-8; | [Y]US2016359424 (TRAN QUYEN [CH], et al) [Y] 9,12,13 * figure 1 ** paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0041] * | International search | [A]JP2017135918 (TOSHIBA MITSUBISHI-ELECTRIC IND SYSTEM CORP) [A] 1-13 * , paragraphs [0067]-[0073], fig. 1, 4, 6 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2018113792 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-13* , front page (Family: none) * | Examination | US5170769 | - Anonymous, "Circular buffer - Wikipedia", (20181004), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Circular_buffer&oldid=862395106, (20210716), XP055825125 | by applicant | JP2007306758 |