EP3770855 - INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, PERSON SEARCH SYSTEM, PLACE ESTIMATION METHOD, AND NON-TEMPORARY COMPUTER-READABLE MEDIUM IN WHICH PROGRAM IS STORED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku 108-8001 Tokyo / JP | [2021/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIMADA Taisuke c/o NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato- ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2021/04] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [2021/04] | Application number, filing date | 18910933.3 | 26.10.2018 | [2021/04] | WO2018JP39858 | Priority number, date | JP20180056862 | 23.03.2018 Original published format: JP 2018056862 | [2021/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019181047 | Date: | 26.09.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3770855 | Date: | 27.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/292 | [2021/04] | CPC: |
G06T7/246 (EP);
G06V40/172 (EP,US);
G06T7/215 (US);
G06T7/292 (EP);
G06V20/41 (US);
G06V20/46 (US);
G06V20/52 (EP);
G06V40/166 (US);
H04N7/18 (EP);
G06T2207/20076 (EP);
G06T2207/30196 (EP);
G06T2207/30201 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, PERSONENSUCHSYSTEM, ORTSSCHÄTZUNGSVERFAHREN UND NICHT-TEMPORÄRES COMPUTERLESBARES MEDIUM, IN DEM DAS PROGRAMM GESPEICHERT IST | [2021/04] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, PERSON SEARCH SYSTEM, PLACE ESTIMATION METHOD, AND NON-TEMPORARY COMPUTER-READABLE MEDIUM IN WHICH PROGRAM IS STORED | [2021/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, SYSTÈME DE RECHERCHE DE PERSONNE, PROCÉDÉ D'ESTIMATION DE LIEU ET SUPPORT NON TEMPORAIRE LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR DANS LEQUEL UN PROGRAMME EST STOCKÉ | [2021/04] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2020 | Translation filed | 23.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 23.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/04] | 05.02.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]WO2014061342 (NEC CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-6, 8-11 * , paragraphs [0015]-[0058], fig. 3 & US 2015/0294159 A1, paragraphs [0022]-[0072], fig. 3 * [A] 7; | [YA]JP2016143312 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 1-6, 8-11 * , paragraphs [0038], [0071] (Family: none) * [A] 7; | [YA]JP2016163328 (CANON KK) [Y] 5-6 * , paragraphs [0047]-[0049] & US 2016/0261808 A1, paragraphs [0083]-[0085] *[A] 7; | [YA]JP2018032950 (CANON KK) [Y] 1-6, 8-11 * , paragraphs [0031], [0032] & US 2018/0061065 A1, paragraphs [0041], [0042] * [A] 7 | by applicant | JP2013092955 | WO2014148395 | JP2018056862 |