EP3764631 - INTELLIGENT ASSISTANT CONTROL METHOD AND TERMINAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SONG, Lei Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
GUO, Xin Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
CHEN, Xiaomeng Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
ZHANG, Yunchao Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 05 /
CHEN, Xin Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/25] |
Former [2021/02] | 01 /
SONG, Lei Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | ||
02 /
GUO, Xin Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | |||
03 /
CHEN, Xiaomeng Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | |||
04 /
ZHANG, Yunchao Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | |||
05 /
CHEN, Xin Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2021/02] | Application number, filing date | 18912032.2 | 26.03.2018 | [2021/02] | WO2018CN80555 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019183775 | Date: | 03.10.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3764631 | Date: | 13.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3764631 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04N23/63, H04N23/60, H04N23/667 | [2023/07] | CPC: |
H04N23/64 (EP,US);
H04N23/60 (RU);
H04N23/80 (KR);
H04N23/667 (EP,KR,US);
H04N23/617 (US);
H04N23/62 (KR);
H04N23/631 (KR);
H04N23/632 (EP,KR);
H04N23/66 (US);
H04N23/67 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/02] | H04N5/232 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR INTELLIGENTEN ASSISTENTEN UND ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG | [2021/02] | English: | INTELLIGENT ASSISTANT CONTROL METHOD AND TERMINAL DEVICE | [2021/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'ASSISTANT NUMÉRIQUE ET DISPOSITIF TERMINAL | [2021/02] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2020 | Translation filed | 05.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 05.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/02] | 30.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.06.2023 | CZ | 21.06.2023 | DK | 21.06.2023 | EE | 21.06.2023 | ES | 21.06.2023 | FI | 21.06.2023 | HR | 21.06.2023 | IT | 21.06.2023 | LT | 21.06.2023 | LV | 21.06.2023 | PL | 21.06.2023 | RO | 21.06.2023 | RS | 21.06.2023 | SE | 21.06.2023 | SI | 21.06.2023 | SK | 21.06.2023 | SM | 21.06.2023 | NO | 21.09.2023 | GR | 22.09.2023 | IS | 21.10.2023 | PT | 23.10.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/25] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
DK | 21.06.2023 | ||
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SI | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
PT | 23.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
DK | 21.06.2023 | ||
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
PT | 23.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
PT | 23.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | FI | 21.06.2023 | |
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | FI | 21.06.2023 | |
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | SE | 21.06.2023 | |
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | SE | 21.06.2023 | |
NO | 21.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1802096 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [Y] 3 * figure 7 *; | [Y]US2009237548 (WATANABE MAKOTO [JP], et al) [Y] 2 * figures 4-9 *; | [IY]US2014240531 (NAKAI TAKAO [JP], et al) [I] 1,10,11 * the whole document * [Y] 2-9; | [Y]EP3018892 (CANON KK [JP]) [Y] 4-9* figures 5-7 * | International search | [Y]US2010277609 (ABE HIROYUKI [JP]) [Y] 1-5, 8, 9, 11-13* description, paragraphs 0083-0140, and figures 7-10 *; | [Y]CN102457673 (HIGH TECH COMP CORP) [Y] 1-13 * description, paragraphs 0037, 0039, and 0043-0046 *; | [Y]CN103188423 (FUTAIHUA IND SHENZHEN CO LTD, et al) [Y] 1-5, 8, 9, 11-13 * description, paragraphs 0020-0025 *; | [Y]CN103841324 (BEIJING XIAOMI TECHNOLOGY CO) [Y] 1-5, 8, 9, 11-13 * description, paragraphs 0007-0049 and 0091 *; | [Y]CN104243822 (SAMSUNG GUANGZHOU MOBILE R & D CT, et al) [Y] 5-9 * description, paragraphs 0071, 0083, 0084, and 0089 *; | [Y]CN104660908 (SHENZHEN ZTE MOBILE TECH CO) [Y] 1-13 * description, paragraphs 0043, 0044, 0068-0075, 0081, 0102, and 0105, and figures 1 and 3 *; | [Y]CN106101536 (VIVO COMM TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [Y] 2, 10 * description, paragraph 0059 *; | [Y]CN107229625 (BEIJING SOGOU TECH DEV CO) [Y] 1-5, 8, 9, 11-13 * description, paragraphs 0107-0211 * | Examination | US2007065137 | US2007171282 |