EP3631289 - LED SIGNALIZATION LIGHT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.09.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.05.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.12.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Serdar Plastik Sanayi ve Ticaret Anonim Sirketi Türkmenistan Caddesi No. 1-3 OSB 06395 Sincan/Ankara / TR | [2024/43] |
Former [2020/15] | For all designated states Serdar Plastik Sanayi Ve Ticaret Anonim Sirketi Türkmenistan Caddesi No. 1-3 OSB 06395 Sincan/Ankara / TR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TUTEK, Serdar Turkmenistan Street No:1-3 OSB, 06395 Sincan/Ankara / TR | [2020/15] | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [2024/43] |
Former [2020/15] | Heubeck, Christian Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18913198.0 | 06.03.2018 | [2020/15] | WO2018TR00018 | Priority number, date | TR20170003366 | 06.03.2017 Original published format: TR 201703366 | [2020/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2019240678 | Date: | 19.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3631289 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3631289 | Date: | 23.10.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F21S45/50 | [2020/15] | CPC: |
F21S45/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LED-SIGNALISIERUNGSLICHT | [2020/15] | English: | LED SIGNALIZATION LIGHT | [2020/15] | French: | FEU DE SIGNALISATION À DEL | [2020/15] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 07.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/15] | 07.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.09.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE19830961 (KOITO MFG CO LTD [JP]); | [A]US2001040811 (CHASE LEE A [US], et al); | [A]US2005117362 (YAMADA TERUHISA [JP], et al); | [A]US2010020541 (INCORVIA SAMUEL A [US], et al); | [A]EP2206628 (WOOKANG TECH CO LTD [KR]); | [X]US2011116281 (KUROIWA YUUJI [JP], et al) |