EP3788686 - RECEPTACLE ISOLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.07.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 10300 Energy Drive Spring TX 77389 / US | [2021/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHELTON, Gerold, Keith 11311 Chinden Blvd Boise, Idaho 83714 / US | 02 /
NOTTINGHAM, Kyle, J 11311 Chinden Blvd Boise, Idaho 83714 / US | 03 /
FREDERICKSON, Matthew 11311 Chinden Blvd Boise, Idaho 83714 / US | [2021/10] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/10] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 18917193.7 | 30.04.2018 | [2021/10] | WO2018US30272 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019212506 | Date: | 07.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3788686 | Date: | 10.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 07.11.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00, G06Q10/06, G06Q10/08 | [2021/50] | CPC: |
G06Q10/20 (EP,KR,US);
G06Q10/10 (KR);
G07C9/00563 (US);
G06F21/31 (KR);
G06Q10/0631 (EP,KR);
G06Q10/08 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [2021/10] | H02B11/133, G06Q10/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/10] | Title | German: | BEHÄLTERISOLIERUNG | [2021/10] | English: | RECEPTACLE ISOLATION | [2021/10] | French: | ISOLATION DE RÉCIPIENT | [2021/10] | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.2020 | Search fee paid | 11.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.2020 | Examination requested [2021/10] | 29.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - Lennox-Steele Ashleigh ET AL, "A forensic examination of several mobile device Faraday bags & materials to test their effectiveness", Australian Digital Forensics Conference Conferences The Proceedings of 14th Australian Digital Forensics Conference This Conference Proceeding is posted at Research Online, doi:10.4225/75/58a550b153635, (20161231), pages 34 - 41, URL: https://ro.ecu.edu.au/cgi/viewcontent.cgi?article=1165&context=adf, (20210729), XP055828960 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4225/75/58a550b153635 | International search | [Y]US2010088192 (BOWLES MARK [US], et al) [Y] 4-7, 13-15 * , paragraphs [0006], [0036], [0042], [0047] *; | [A]US2012246083 (BOWLES MARK [US], et al) [A] 1-15; | [XY]US2014239883 (HOBSON IAN TIMOTHY [GB], et al) [X] 1-3, 8-13 * , paragraphs [0012], [0013], [0047], [0056] -[0060], [0064], [0068], [0069], [0092] -[0096], [0104] -[0108], [0112], [0131], [0140], [0169] * [Y] 4-7, 13-15; | [A]US2016101939 (RUTLEDGE RICHARD S [US], et al)[A] 1-15 |