EP3673537 - PARABOLIC REFLECTOR ANTENNAS THAT SUPPORT LOW SIDE LOBE RADIATION PATTERNS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Outdoor Wireless Networks LLC 3642 E. US Highway 70 Claremont North Carolina 28610 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2024/36] | For all designated states Outdoor Wireless Networks LLC 3642 E. US Highway 70 Claremont North Carolina 28610 / US | ||
Former [2024/21] | For all designated states CommScope Technologies LLC 3642 E US Highway 70 Claremont, NC 28610 / US | ||
Former [2020/27] | For all designated states CommScope Technologies LLC 1100 CommScope Place SE Hickory, NC 28602 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRANDAU, Ronald J. 14613 W. 163rd Street Homer Glen, Illinois 60491 / US | [2020/27] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/27] | Parker, Andrew James Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18917641.5 | 21.08.2018 | [2020/27] | WO2018US47147 | Priority number, date | US201762548756P | 22.08.2017 Original published format: US 201762548756 P | [2020/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2019216935 | Date: | 14.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3673537 | Date: | 01.07.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.12.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q19/19 | [2021/20] | CPC: |
H01Q19/193 (EP,US);
H01Q13/06 (US);
H01Q13/065 (US);
H01Q15/16 (US)
|
Former IPC [2020/27] | H01Q19/10, H01Q19/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/27] | Title | German: | PARABOLANTENNEN, DIE STRAHLUNGSMUSTER MIT NIEDRIGER NEBENKEULE UNTERSTÜTZEN | [2020/27] | English: | PARABOLIC REFLECTOR ANTENNAS THAT SUPPORT LOW SIDE LOBE RADIATION PATTERNS | [2020/27] | French: | MIROIRS PARABOLIQUES QUI SUPPORTENT DES DIAGRAMMES DE RAYONNEMENT DE LOBES SECONDAIRES FAIBLES | [2020/27] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 17.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/27] | 28.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9853525 (ENDGATE TECHNOLOGY CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract ** page 4, line 1 - page 7, line 12 *; | [Y]US6137449 (KILDAL PER-SIMON [SE]) [Y] 9 * abstract * * paragraph [0052] *; | [A]US2005017916 (LEWRY MATTHEW [GB], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0021] - [0032] *; | [Y]WO2011073844 (HILLS CHRIS [GB], et al) [Y] 5,6 * abstract * * page 8, paragraph 3 - page 9, paragraph 1 *; | [IY]US2015042527 (BRANDAU RONALD J [US]) [I] 1-4,7,8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0023] - [0024] * [Y] 5,6,9 | International search | [Y]US6137449 (KILDAL PER-SIMON [SE]) [Y] 13, 14, 19-21 * ; ntire document, especially, abstract, FIG.11-14, col.7, In 59 - col.8, In 4 *; | [Y]US6184840 (HSIN-LOUG LIN [TW], et al) [Y] 3-6 * ; entire document, especially, abstract, col.2, In 62-67 *; | [A]US7075492 (CHEN MING H [US], et al) [A] 1-6, 11-14, 18-21 * ; entire document, *; | [Y]US2013300621 (BRANDAU RONALD J [US], et al) [Y] 1-6, 11-14, 18-21 * ; entire document, especially, abstract, FIG. 2A,2b, 3, 7A,14-19, para [0019], [0046] - [0050], [0053]. [0055]. [0058], [0060], [0061] [0144], *; | [Y]US2014218248 (SCHULZ GARY D [US], et al) [Y] 1-6, 11-14, 18-21 * ; entire document, especially, abstract, FIG.7A, 23A, para [0054], [0144], [0162], [0163] *; | [A]US2014247191 (MAHON JOHN P [US]) [A] 1-6, 11-14, 18-21 * ; entire document *; | [PA]WO2018057824 (COMMSCOPE TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US]) [PA] 1-6, 11-14, 18-21* ; * | by applicant | US6919855 | US8581795 | US2015042527 | US9019164 |