EP3791592 - A METHOD AND TECHNICAL EQUIPMENT FOR ENCODING AND DECODING VOLUMETRIC VIDEO [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.09.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2024 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2021/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MALAMAL VADAKITAL, Vinod Kumar Insinöörinkatu 54 B 38 33720 Tampere / FI | 02 /
ROIMELA, Kimmo Annalankatu 17 C 9 33710 Tampere / FI | 03 /
PYSTYNEN, Johannes Manninkuja 3 33870 Tampere / FI | [2021/11] | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2021/11] | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 18917954.2 | 07.05.2018 | [2021/11] | WO2018FI50335 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019215377 | Date: | 14.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3791592 | Date: | 17.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 14.11.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/597, G06T15/50, H04N13/268, G06T7/557, G06T9/00 | [2021/49] | CPC: |
G06T15/506 (EP);
H04N19/597 (EP,US);
H04N13/194 (EP);
H04N13/243 (EP,US);
H04N13/268 (EP);
H04N13/344 (EP,US);
H04N19/119 (EP,US);
H04N19/132 (EP);
H04N19/167 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/11] | H04N19/597, G06T15/50, H04N13/268, G06T7/557 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/11] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND TECHNISCHE AUSRÜSTUNG ZUR CODIERUNG UND DECODIERUNG EINES VOLUMETRISCHEN VIDEOS | [2021/11] | English: | A METHOD AND TECHNICAL EQUIPMENT FOR ENCODING AND DECODING VOLUMETRIC VIDEO | [2021/11] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET ÉQUIPEMENT TECHNIQUE PERMETTANT DE CODER ET DÉCODER UNE VIDÉO VOLUMÉTRIQUE | [2021/11] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 07.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/11] | 04.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2024 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.11.2024 | 19.11.2024 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2002159628 (MATUSIK WOJCIECH [US], et al) [A] * abstract; paragraphs [0018]-[0019], [0029]-[0030], [0039], [0045], [0048]-[0051]; Fig. 1 *; | [X]US2004041816 (YAMAUCHI YASUNOBU [JP]) [X] 1-13 * abstract; paragraphs [0033]-[0040], [0045]-[0050], [0061]-[0062], [0068], [0076]-[0080]; Figs. 2-7, 10 *; | [X]US2006143142 (VASILESCU MANUELA A O [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * abstract; paragraphs [0029], [0049], [0127], [0139]-[0143], [0153]; Figs. 12, 16-17, 19, 26, 28 *; | [X]US2018097867 (PANG DEREK [US], et al) [X] 1, 4-6, 9-13 * abstract; paragraphs [0156]-[0158], [0193]-[0194], [0282]-[0284], [0300]-[0301], [0314]-[0316], [0382]-[0383], [0386]-[0387], [0420]-[0423]; Figs. 6-9, 37, 40-46B *; | [X] - VASILESCU, M.A.O. et al., "TensorTextures: Multilinear Image-Based Rendering", ACM Transactions on Graphics, vol. 23, no. 3, (20040000), pages 336 - 342, URL: https://dl.acm.org/citation.cfm?id=1015725, (20190310), XP058318399 [X] 1-13 * abstract; section 3; Figs. 1-2, 4, 8, 11, 13 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1186562.1015725 | [A] - FILIP, J. et al., "Bidirectional Texture Function Modeling: A State of the Art Survey", In: IEEE Transactions on Pattern Analysis and Machine Intelligence, vol. 31, no. 11, (20081017), pages 1921 - 1940, URL: https://ieeexplore.ieee.org/document/4653495, (20190310), XP011266778 [A] * abstract; sections 2, 4; Figs. 3-4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TPAMI.2008.246 |