EP3791052 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ASSESSING ENGINE FAULTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOLVO TRUCK CORPORATION 405 08 Göteborg / SE | [2021/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEYER, Stephen 67 Hearthside Lane Greencastle, PA 17225 / US | 02 /
HOOVER, Dale 3068 Breezy Point Road McConnellsburg, PA 17233 / US | [2021/11] | Representative(s) | Kransell & Wennborg KB P.O. Box 2096 403 12 Göteborg / SE | [2021/11] | Application number, filing date | 18918274.4 | 10.05.2018 | [2021/11] | WO2018US32125 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019216901 | Date: | 14.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3791052 | Date: | 17.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3791052 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.11.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/021, B01D46/00, F01N3/00, F01N11/00, F02D41/02, F02D41/04 | [2021/11] | CPC: |
F01N3/021 (EP);
F01N9/002 (US);
F01N11/00 (EP);
F01N9/005 (EP);
F02D41/029 (EP,US);
F02D41/1466 (EP);
F02D41/1467 (EP);
F02D41/22 (EP);
F01N2560/05 (EP,US);
F01N2900/1606 (EP,US);
F01N3/023 (US);
F02D2200/0812 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR BEWERTUNG VON MOTORFEHLERN | [2021/11] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ASSESSING ENGINE FAULTS | [2021/11] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME D'ÉVALUATION DE DÉFAILLANCES DE MOTEUR | [2021/11] | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 09.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 09.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/11] | 11.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2546484 (ISUZU MOTORS LTD [JP]); | [A]US2017211453 (SAPPOK ALEXANDER G [US], et al); | [A]WO2018044770 (CTS CORP [US]) | International search | [A]US2008155964 (KILKENNY JONATHAN PATRICK [US]); | [A]US2014123608 (SUN MIN [US], et al); | [A]US2015167517 (DONG QUNLONG [US], et al); | [X]US2017182447 (SAPPOK ALEXANDER G [US], et al) | by applicant | EP2546484 | US2017211453 | WO2018044770 |