EP3792456 - SHROUD ASSEMBLY FOR GAS TURBINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kawasaki Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1 Higashikawasaki-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 650-8670 / JP | [2021/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUSUMOTO, Yoshiaki c/o KAWASAKI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Higashikawasaki-cho 3- chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 650-8670 / JP | 02 /
NISHIURA, Takeo c/o KAWASAKI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Higashikawasaki-cho 3- chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 650-8670 / JP | [2021/11] | Representative(s) | Dantz, Jan Henning, et al Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [2021/11] | Application number, filing date | 18918352.8 | 11.05.2018 | [2021/11] | WO2018JP18323 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019215913 | Date: | 14.11.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3792456 | Date: | 17.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3792456 | Date: | 12.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.11.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F01D11/08, F01D9/04, F02C7/28 | [2021/11] | CPC: |
F01D11/08 (EP,US);
F01D25/24 (US);
F01D25/28 (US);
F02C7/28 (EP);
F01D25/246 (EP);
F05D2220/32 (US);
F05D2240/11 (EP,US);
F05D2240/55 (US);
F05D2260/36 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UMMANTELUNGSANORDNUNG FÜR EINE GASTURBINE | [2021/11] | English: | SHROUD ASSEMBLY FOR GAS TURBINE | [2021/11] | French: | ENSEMBLE CARÉNAGE POUR TURBINE À GAZ | [2021/11] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2020 | Translation filed | 08.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 08.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/11] | 26.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5127793 (WALKER ALAN [US], et al); | [A]US5169287 (PROCTOR ROBERT [US], et al); | [A]WO2015109292 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]); | [A]US2016251982 (SHAPIRO JASON DAVID [US]); | [A]EP3118417 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) | International search | [A]US2004062640 (DARKINS TOBY GEORGE [US], et al); | [A]US2005158168 (BRUCE KEVIN L [US], et al); | [A]US2016376901 (O'LEARY MARK [US], et al); | [A]JP2017025911 (GENERAL ELECTRIC CO GE); | [A]JP2017075600 (GENERAL ELECTRIC CO GE); | [A]JP2017524089 | by applicant | JPH10103011 | US2004047726 | US7044709 | JP2015227661 |