EP3785247 - AUTOTUNE BOLUS ANTENNA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.01.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee | 13.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Phase IV Engineering, Inc. 2820 Wilderness Place Suite C, Unit C Boulder, CO 80301 / US | [2021/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATLIN, Mark, Daniel 444 James Canyon Drive Denver, CO 80302 / US | 02 /
DALGLEISH, Scott, David 5479 Seneca Place Denver, CO 80302 / US | [2021/09] | Representative(s) | Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | [2021/09] | Application number, filing date | 18918886.5 | 30.10.2018 | [2021/09] | WO2018US58245 | Priority number, date | US201815965641 | 27.04.2018 Original published format: US201815965641 | [2021/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019221779 | Date: | 21.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3785247 | Date: | 03.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.11.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G08C19/00, H04B1/036, H04B1/3888, H04B1/04 | [2022/04] | CPC: |
A01K11/007 (EP,US);
A61B5/0008 (EP,US);
A61B5/01 (EP,US);
A61B5/073 (EP,US);
H01Q1/2208 (EP,US);
H01Q1/273 (EP,US);
H01Q21/0075 (US);
H01Q21/06 (US);
H01Q21/29 (EP,US);
H01Q9/26 (EP,US);
H04B1/0458 (EP);
A61B2503/40 (EP,US);
A61B2560/0214 (EP,US);
A61B2562/0219 (EP,US);
A61B5/1118 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/09] | G08C19/00, H04B15/00, H04B1/02, H04B1/036, H04B1/3888 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/09] | Title | German: | BOLUSANTENNE MIT AUTOMATISCHER ABSTIMMUNG | [2021/09] | English: | AUTOTUNE BOLUS ANTENNA | [2021/09] | French: | ANTENNE À BOLUS À ACCORD AUTOMATIQUE | [2021/09] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 15.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/09] | 01.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2023 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   12.04.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009102663 (HILLEGASS RAYMOND R [US]); | [A]US2016070942 (DOR GUY [IL], et al); | [A]US2016360994 (RETTEDAL NICHOLAS P [US], et al) | International search | [A]US2010328098 (STEIN MARC [US], et al); | [A]US2011059706 (HAREL HAIM [US], et al); | [A]US2017264010 (SHI PING [US]) | by applicant | US2009102663 | US2016070942 | US2016360994 |