EP3686932 - IMAGE SENSOR AND RELATED HANDHELD APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.04.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.05.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHENZHEN GOODIX TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD. Floor 13 Phase B, Tengfei Industrial Building Futian Free Trade Zone Shenzhen, Guangdong 518045 / CN | [2020/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAO, Wei-Min Floor 13 Phase B Tengfei Industrial Building Futian Free Trade Zone Shenzhen, Guangdong 518045 / CN | [2020/31] | Representative(s) | Casalonga Casalonga & Partners Bayerstraße 71/73 80335 München / DE | [2020/31] | Application number, filing date | 18919397.2 | 20.11.2018 | [2020/31] | WO2018CN116317 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020102959 | Date: | 28.05.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3686932 | Date: | 29.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 28.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/146 | [2020/31] | CPC: |
H01L27/1463 (EP,US);
H01L27/14623 (EP,CN,US);
G06V40/1318 (EP,US);
H01L27/1462 (US);
H01L27/14627 (US);
H01L27/14643 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/31] | Title | German: | BILDSENSOR UND ZUGEHÖRIGES HANDGERÄT | [2020/31] | English: | IMAGE SENSOR AND RELATED HANDHELD APPARATUS | [2020/31] | French: | CAPTEUR D'IMAGE ET APPAREIL PORTATIF ASSOCIÉ | [2020/31] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2019 | Translation filed | 27.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2019 | Search fee paid | 27.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/31] | 16.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2017220844 (JONES ERIC [US], et al) [Y] 15 * paragraph [0079] ** figure 10 *; | [XYI]US2018301494 (PARK JONGHOON [KR], et al) [X] 1-7,9-14 * paragraphs [0038] - [0048] - [0 59] - [0064] - [0 93] - [0095] * * figures 5, 6, 16, 17 * [Y] 15 [I] 8 |