EP3805751 - ROTOR TOOTH CRACK INSPECTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.04.2024 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2021/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OYA, Takashi c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
UCHIMURA, Masanori c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2021/15] | 01 /
OYA Takashi c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | ||
02 /
UCHIMURA Masanori c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2021/15] | Application number, filing date | 18919477.2 | 25.05.2018 | [2021/15] | WO2018JP20150 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019225003 | Date: | 28.11.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3805751 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.11.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01N29/04, G01N29/26, G01N29/07, H02K15/02, G01N29/06 | [2021/24] | CPC: |
G01N29/262 (EP);
H02K15/02 (EP,US);
G01N29/041 (US);
G01N29/043 (EP);
G01N29/069 (EP);
G01N29/07 (EP);
G01N29/26 (EP);
H02K1/26 (US);
G01N2291/106 (EP);
G01N2291/2693 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/15] | G01N29/04, G01N29/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/15] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR INSPEKTION VON ROTORZAHNRISSEN | [2021/15] | English: | ROTOR TOOTH CRACK INSPECTION METHOD | [2021/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'INSPECTION DE FISSURE DE DENT DE ROTOR | [2021/15] | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.2020 | Translation filed | 09.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 09.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/15] | 08.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 13.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - LONDERGAN M B ET AL, "Generator rotor tooth top cracking. Experience and diagnosis", PWR - DESIGN, REPAIR, AND REFURBISHMENT OF STEAM TURBINES; 1991 INTERNATIONAL JOINT POWER GENERATION CONFERENCE; 19911006 TO 19911010; SAN DIEGO, CA, USA, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF MECHANICAL ENGINEERS, POWER DIVISION, US, (19911006), vol. 13, ISBN 978-0-7918-0820-7, pages 71 - 78, XP009526985 [A] 1,2 * abstract * * Part "Thru-Ring UT Inspection Methods" * | International search | [A]US4457176 (SCHOLZ ARTHUR [CH]) [A] 1-2* (Family: none) *; | [Y]JPH02150766 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 1-2 * , page 1, lower right column to page 2, upper right column, fig. 8 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2001099817 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [Y] 1-2 * , paragraphs [0031], [0056], fig. 5, 8 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2001116728 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-2 * (Family: none) *; | [A]US2006236768 (BENTZEL EDWARD L [US]) [A] 1-2 * (Family: none) *; | [A]US2006236767 (BENTZEL EDWARD L [US]) [A] 1-2 * (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2007116894 (GEN ELECTRIC) [A] 1-2 * & US 2007/0089517 A1 & EP 1777513 A1 & CN 1967207 A *; | [Y]JP2010008212 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 1-2 * , paragraphs [0001]-[0007], [0010], [0040]-[0045], [0056]-[0058], fig. 1-3, 10-17 & US 2009/0320600 A1, paragraphs [0001]-[0010], [0013], [0064]-[0068], [0079]-[0081], fig. 1-3, 10-17 & FR 2933190 A & CN 101614704 A & ZA 200903197 A & AU 2009201801 A *; | [Y]JP2017138315 (SIEMENS ENERGY INC) [Y] 2 * , paragraphs [0002]-[0006] & US 2017/0219533 A1, paragraphs [0002]-[0006] & DE 102016226161 A & FR 3047319 A * | by applicant | JPS62291560 |