EP3798544 - ICE-CRUSHING DEVICE AND REFRIGERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LV, NL | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qingdao Haier Co., Ltd. Haier Industry Park Haier Road No.1 Laoshan District Qingdao Shandong 266101 / CN | [2021/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Kui Haier Industry Park, Haier Road No. 1, Laoshan District Qingdao, Shandong 266101 / CN | 02 /
ZHU, Xiaobing Haier Industry Park, Haier Road No. 1, Laoshan District Qingdao, Shandong 266101 / CN | 03 /
ZHANG, Yanqing Haier Industry Park, Haier Road No. 1, Laoshan District Qingdao, Shandong 266101 / CN | 04 /
CUI, Chuan Haier Industry Park, Haier Road No. 1, Laoshan District Qingdao, Shandong 266101 / CN | 05 /
XUE, Jianjun Haier Industry Park, Haier Road No. 1, Laoshan District Qingdao, Shandong 266101 / CN | 06 /
DU, Qihai Haier Industry Park, Haier Road No. 1, Laoshan District Qingdao, Shandong 266101 / CN | [2021/13] | Representative(s) | Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | [2021/13] | Application number, filing date | 18920074.4 | 26.12.2018 | [2021/13] | WO2018CN123732 | Priority number, date | CN201810489514 | 21.05.2018 Original published format: CN201810489514 | [2021/13] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019223308 | Date: | 28.11.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3798544 | Date: | 31.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3798544 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 28.11.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F25C5/04 | [2021/13] | CPC: |
F25C5/046 (EP,CN,US);
F25C2400/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EISZERKLEINERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND KÜHLSCHRANK | [2021/13] | English: | ICE-CRUSHING DEVICE AND REFRIGERATOR | [2021/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE BROYAGE DE GLACE ET RÉFRIGÉRATEUR | [2021/13] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2020 | Translation filed | 27.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 27.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2020 | Examination requested [2021/13] | 07.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 27.12.2023 | FI | 27.12.2023 | HR | 27.12.2023 | LT | 27.12.2023 | LV | 27.12.2023 | NL | 27.12.2023 | RS | 27.12.2023 | SE | 27.12.2023 | BG | 27.03.2024 | NO | 27.03.2024 | GR | 28.03.2024 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/25] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | FI | 27.12.2023 | |
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 28.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CN100337078C (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,2 * figure 4 *; | [Y]US2013104587 (NUSS BART ANDREW [US], et al) [Y] 5 * figure 4 *; | [Y]CN205336029U (CHANGXIN POWER (SHENZHEN) TECH CO LTD) [Y] 9* figure 2 *; | [XAY]CN107940850 (QINGDAO HAIER CO LTD) [X] 1-4,10 * figures 1-3 * [A] 6-8 [Y] 5,9 |