EP3779937 - FOLDABLE DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Bo Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
LI, Xiaolong Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
MAO, Weihua Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
ZHANG, Hui Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 05 /
WU, Bo Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 06 /
ZHA, Peng Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2021/07] | Application number, filing date | 18920783.0 | 28.05.2018 | [2021/07] | WO2018CN88760 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019227296 | Date: | 05.12.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3779937 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 05.12.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G09F9/30, G06F1/16, G06F3/0488, H04M1/02 | [2021/19] | CPC: |
G06F1/1641 (EP,US);
G06F1/1652 (EP,US);
G06F1/1616 (EP,US);
G06F1/1675 (EP);
G06F1/1679 (EP);
G06F1/1681 (EP);
G06F1/1686 (EP,US);
G06F3/04883 (EP);
G09F9/30 (EP);
H04M1/0214 (EP);
H04M1/0247 (EP);
H04M1/0268 (EP,US);
H10K50/84 (US);
G06F2203/04803 (EP);
H04B1/3827 (US);
H04M2250/16 (EP);
H04M2250/22 (EP);
H04M2250/52 (EP);
H10K2102/311 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/07] | G09F9/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Title | German: | FALTBARE ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2021/07] | English: | FOLDABLE DISPLAY DEVICE | [2021/07] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE PLIABLE | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2020 | Translation filed | 02.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 02.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 02.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2014285476 (CHO EUNHYUNG [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,10,11,13 * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0069]; figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0115] - paragraph [0123]; figures 13,14 * * paragraph [0154] - paragraph [0159]; figures 23,24 * * paragraph [0202] - paragraph [0203]; figures 33,34 * * paragraph [0250] - paragraph [0260]; figures 41,42 * [I] 4-9,12,14,15; | [A]EP3023856 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0180] - paragraph [0187]; figures 3,4 * * paragraph [0192] - paragraph [0196] * * paragraph [0199] - paragraph [0201]; figures 5,6 * * paragraph [0206] - paragraph [0220]; figures 7,8 *; | [A]CN107195253 (WUHAN TIANMA MICRO ELECTRONICS CO LTD ) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0037]; figures 2-5 * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0069]; figures 10,11 *; | [X]US2018004252 (AHRENS MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1,10-13 * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0078]; figures 14-15 * * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0084]; figures 16-19 *; | [A]US2018046220 (KIM MYUNG HWAN [KR], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0209] - paragraph [0210]; figures 16A,16B *; | [XA]USD812605S (SENDA NAOYUKI [JP]) [X] 1,13 * the whole document * [A] 10-12 | International search | [A]US2011241998 (MCKINNEY SUSAN [US], et al) [A] 1-18* entire document *; | [Y]CN204374828U (ZHAO XUEBO) [Y] 1-18 * description, paragraphs 25-27, and figures 1-3 *; | [Y]CN105788458 (LG DISPLAY CO LTD) [Y] 1-18 * description, paragraphs 33-94, and figures 1-6 *; | [Y]CN105810104 (SAMSUNG DISPLAY CO LTD) [Y] 1-18 * description, paragraphs 35-50, and figures 1A-1C and 3A-3C * |