EP3814165 - A METHOD OF USING AIR AND HELIUM IN LOW-PRESSURE TUBE TRANSPORTATION SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.11.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, CH | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hyperloop Transportation Technologies, Inc. 11844 Jefferson Blvd Culver City, California 90230 / US | [2021/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEOPHYTOU, Alexandre 135 Avenue Du Comminges 31270 Cugnaux / FR | 02 /
SARIN, Michael 11844 Jefferson Blvd. Culver City, California 90230 / US | 03 /
ZISA, Alexandre 135 Avenue Du Comminges 31270 Cugnaux / FR | 04 /
BALDWIN, Spencer John 11844 Jefferson Blvd. Culver City, California 90230 / US | [2021/18] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/50] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2021/18] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 18924874.3 | 29.06.2018 | [2021/18] | WO2018US40357 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020005278 | Date: | 02.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3814165 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3814165 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60L13/03, B60L13/10, B61B13/08, B61B13/10, B61B13/12, B65G53/04, E01B25/30 | [2021/18] | CPC: |
B61B13/10 (EP);
E01B25/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG VON LUFT UND HELIUM IN NIEDERDRUCKROHRTRANSPORTSYSTEMEN | [2021/18] | English: | A METHOD OF USING AIR AND HELIUM IN LOW-PRESSURE TUBE TRANSPORTATION SYSTEMS | [2021/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION D'AIR ET D'HÉLIUM DANS DES SYSTÈMES DE TRANSPORT PAR TUBE À BASSE PRESSION | [2021/18] | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 27.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/18] | 20.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.11.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2021 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   11.08.2021 | 30.06.2022 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   12.10.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 14.12.2022 | AT | 14.12.2022 | CZ | 14.12.2022 | DK | 14.12.2022 | EE | 14.12.2022 | FI | 14.12.2022 | HR | 14.12.2022 | LT | 14.12.2022 | LV | 14.12.2022 | MC | 14.12.2022 | NL | 14.12.2022 | PL | 14.12.2022 | RO | 14.12.2022 | RS | 14.12.2022 | SE | 14.12.2022 | SI | 14.12.2022 | SK | 14.12.2022 | SM | 14.12.2022 | NO | 14.03.2023 | GR | 15.03.2023 | IS | 14.04.2023 | PT | 14.04.2023 | IE | 29.06.2023 | LU | 29.06.2023 | BE | 30.06.2023 | CH | 30.06.2023 | [2024/25] |
Former [2024/21] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
MC | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SI | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
IE | 29.06.2023 | ||
LU | 29.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/15] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
MC | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SI | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
LU | 29.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
MC | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SI | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SI | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 14.12.2022 | |
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | EE | 14.12.2022 | |
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | FI | 14.12.2022 | |
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | FI | 14.12.2022 | |
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | FI | 14.12.2022 | |
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | FI | 14.12.2022 | |
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | FI | 14.12.2022 | |
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 14.12.2022 | |
NO | 14.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2213210 (BOES CHRISTIAN) [A] 1-30 * the whole document *; | [A]CN101746378 (ZHIXIANG PENG) [A] 1-30* the whole document * | International search | [A]CN101746378 (ZHIXIANG PENG) [A] 1-30* ; entire document *; | [A]US2013276665 (DALRYMPLE DAVID [AU]) [A] 1-30 * ; paragraph [0059] *; | [A] - ETHANNINO, "Hyperloop Tunnel Gasses & Pressures", Chemical Forums, (20130813), pages 1 - 5, URL: http://www.chemicalforums.com/index.php?topic=70167.0, (20130824), XP055770985 [A] 1-30 * . * | [A] - HARRIS S. B., A Helium-Filled Hyperloop One: Call it Helioloop Two, (20180615), URL: https://www.researchgate.net/publication/325536712_A_Helium-Filled_Hyperloop._One_Call_it_Helioloop_Two, (20180824), XP055668384 [A] 1-30 * . * | [A] - ANTHONY S., How does Elon Musk's SF-to-LA-in-30-minutes Hyperloop work?, (20130729), URL: https://www.extremetech.com/extreme/162452-how-does-elon-musks-sf-to-la-in-30-minutes-hyperloop-work, (20180824), XP055770998 [A] 1-30 * . * |