EP3736419 - CENTRIFUGAL COMPRESSOR AND TURBOCHARGER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES ENGINE & TURBOCHARGER, LTD. 3000 Tana Chuo-ku Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa 252-5293 / JP | [2020/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IWAKIRI, Kenichiro C/O MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD., 16-5, Konan 2-Chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | 02 /
FUJITA, Yutaka C/O MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD., 16-5, Konan 2-Chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | 03 /
HAYASHI, Yoshihiro C/O MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD., 16-5, Konan 2-Chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | [2020/46] | Representative(s) | Mader, Joachim Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2020/46] | Application number, filing date | 18925415.4 | 06.07.2018 | [2020/46] | WO2018JP25658 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020008615 | Date: | 09.01.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3736419 | Date: | 11.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3736419 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F02B33/40, F02B37/16, F04D27/02, F04D29/44, F04D29/68 | [2022/48] | CPC: |
F02B37/162 (EP);
F04D27/0215 (US);
F02B33/40 (EP);
F04D17/10 (US);
F04D25/04 (US);
F04D27/023 (EP);
F04D29/4206 (US);
F04D29/441 (EP);
F04D29/682 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/01] | F02B37/16, F02B33/40, F04D29/40 | ||
Former IPC [2020/46] | F02B37/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZENTRIFUGALVERDICHTER UND TURBOLADER | [2020/46] | English: | CENTRIFUGAL COMPRESSOR AND TURBOCHARGER | [2020/46] | French: | COMPRESSEUR CENTRIFUGE ET TURBOCOMPRESSEUR | [2020/46] | Entry into regional phase | 07.08.2020 | Translation filed | 07.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 07.08.2020 | Search fee paid | 07.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/46] | 20.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.05.2023 | CZ | 31.05.2023 | DK | 31.05.2023 | EE | 31.05.2023 | ES | 31.05.2023 | FI | 31.05.2023 | HR | 31.05.2023 | IT | 31.05.2023 | LT | 31.05.2023 | LV | 31.05.2023 | MC | 31.05.2023 | NL | 31.05.2023 | PL | 31.05.2023 | RO | 31.05.2023 | RS | 31.05.2023 | SE | 31.05.2023 | SI | 31.05.2023 | SK | 31.05.2023 | SM | 31.05.2023 | LU | 06.07.2023 | BE | 31.07.2023 | CH | 31.07.2023 | FR | 31.07.2023 | NO | 31.08.2023 | GR | 01.09.2023 | IS | 30.09.2023 | PT | 02.10.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/25] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
CZ | 31.05.2023 | ||
DK | 31.05.2023 | ||
EE | 31.05.2023 | ||
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
MC | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RO | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SI | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
LU | 06.07.2023 | ||
BE | 31.07.2023 | ||
CH | 31.07.2023 | ||
FR | 31.07.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
PT | 02.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/18] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
CZ | 31.05.2023 | ||
DK | 31.05.2023 | ||
EE | 31.05.2023 | ||
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
MC | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RO | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
LU | 06.07.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
PT | 02.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
CZ | 31.05.2023 | ||
DK | 31.05.2023 | ||
EE | 31.05.2023 | ||
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
MC | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RO | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
PT | 02.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
CZ | 31.05.2023 | ||
DK | 31.05.2023 | ||
EE | 31.05.2023 | ||
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RO | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
PT | 02.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 31.05.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2077354 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1,8,9 * abstract * * figures 3-7 ** page 4 *; | [X]WO2011139561 (BORGWARNER INC [US], et al) [X] 1,3,7-9 * abstract * * figures 1-4 * * page 1 - page 3 *; | [XDI]JP2012241558 (IHI CORP) [XD] 1,4,5,7,9 * abstract * * figure 5 * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0044] * [I] 8; | [XI]DE102015215246 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1-7,9 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0039] * [I] 8; | [X]EP3196474 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [X] 1-3,5-9 * abstract * * figures 1-7 * * claims 1-12 * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0022] * | International search | [A]JPS6072927U [A] 1-9 * , *; | [A]JPH10196869 (USUI INTERNATIONAL INDUSTRY) [A] 1-9* , 7 *; | [A]JP2008261507 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-9 * , 11-15, 37-38, 42-43, 49, 60 *; | [A]JP2011153576 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1-9 * , 3, 4-1, 8 *; | [A]JP2012503132 [A] 1-9 * , & US 2011/0088392 A1, & WO 2010/031499 A1 & DE 102008047506 A1 *; | [XA]JP2012241558 (IHI CORP) [X] 1, 4-5, 7, 9 * , [0036] - [0038], 1, 5 (d) & US 2014/0069096 A1, [0049] - [0051], 1, 5D & WO 2012/157598 A1 & EP 2711522 A1 & CN 103608561 A & KR 10-2014-0002049 A * [A] 2-3, 6, 8; | [A]JP2015165096 (DAIHATSU MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-9 * , [0020] *; | [A]JP2017155664 (TOYOTA IND CORP) [A] 1-9 * , * | by applicant | JP2012241558 |