EP3819565 - REFRIGERATION CYCLE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, CH, SI | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2023/14] |
Former [2021/19] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OCHIAI, Yasutaka c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
NAKANO, Haruo c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2021/19] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2021/19] | Application number, filing date | 18925696.9 | 06.07.2018 | [2021/19] | WO2018JP25708 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020008624 | Date: | 09.01.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3819565 | Date: | 12.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3819565 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F25B49/02, F25B13/00, F25B41/24, F25B49/00 | [2021/25] | CPC: |
F25B49/005 (EP);
F25B13/00 (EP);
F25B41/24 (EP);
F25B49/02 (EP);
F25B2313/0314 (EP);
F25B2313/0315 (EP);
F25B2400/12 (EP);
F25B2500/222 (EP);
F25B2600/01 (EP);
F25B2600/2513 (EP);
F25B2600/2519 (EP);
F25B2700/1933 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/19] | F25B49/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KÄLTEKREISLAUFVORRICHTUNG | [2021/19] | English: | REFRIGERATION CYCLE DEVICE | [2021/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF À CYCLE FRIGORIFIQUE | [2021/19] | Entry into regional phase | 29.12.2020 | Translation filed | 29.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 29.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/19] | 14.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 05.04.2023 | AT | 05.04.2023 | CZ | 05.04.2023 | DK | 05.04.2023 | EE | 05.04.2023 | FI | 05.04.2023 | HR | 05.04.2023 | LT | 05.04.2023 | LV | 05.04.2023 | MC | 05.04.2023 | NL | 05.04.2023 | PL | 05.04.2023 | RO | 05.04.2023 | RS | 05.04.2023 | SI | 05.04.2023 | SK | 05.04.2023 | SM | 05.04.2023 | NO | 05.07.2023 | GR | 06.07.2023 | LU | 06.07.2023 | BE | 31.07.2023 | CH | 31.07.2023 | IS | 05.08.2023 | PT | 07.08.2023 | [2024/25] |
Former [2024/18] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2023 | ||
DK | 05.04.2023 | ||
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
MC | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
LU | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2023 | ||
DK | 05.04.2023 | ||
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
MC | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2023 | ||
DK | 05.04.2023 | ||
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | NL | 05.04.2023 | |
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | NL | 05.04.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2000249385 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [Y] 3* paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0053]; figures 1-3 *; | [IDY]JP2005241050 (MITSUBISHI ELEC BUILDING TECHN) [ID] 1,2,4,5 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0029]; figures 1-4 * [Y] 3; | [A]JP2014145565 (MIURA KOGYO KK) [A] 1 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0057]; figure 1 * | International search | [Y]JP2000249385 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [Y] 3-5* , *; | [Y]JP2005241050 (MITSUBISHI ELEC BUILDING TECHN) [Y] 1-7 * , *; | [Y]JP2014145565 (MIURA KOGYO KK) [Y] 1-7 * , * | by applicant | JP2005241050 |