EP3821573 - RANDOM ACCESS RESOURCE ALLOCATION FOR INTEGRATED ACCESS AND BACKHAUL NODES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.12.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2021/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Junfeng ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
BI, Feng ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
HAO, Peng ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2021/20] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2021/20] | Application number, filing date | 18925774.4 | 10.07.2018 | [2021/20] | WO2018CN95064 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020010498 | Date: | 16.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3821573 | Date: | 19.05.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 16.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/709 | [2021/20] | CPC: |
H04W74/006 (EP,CN,KR);
H04L27/26 (RU);
H04W72/0446 (CN,KR);
H04W74/0833 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
H04L27/2605 (US);
H04L41/0803 (US);
H04W72/044 (RU,US);
H04W72/0453 (CN,KR);
H04W72/046 (CN,RU);
H04W84/047 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/20] | Title | German: | BETRIEBSMITTELZUTEILUNG MIT WAHLFREIEM ZUGRIFF FÜR INTEGRIERTE ZUGANGS- UND BACKHAUL-KNOTEN | [2021/20] | English: | RANDOM ACCESS RESOURCE ALLOCATION FOR INTEGRATED ACCESS AND BACKHAUL NODES | [2021/20] | French: | ATTRIBUTION DE RESSOURCE D'ACCÈS ALÉATOIRE À DES NOEUDS D'ACCÈS ET DE BACKHAUL INTÉGRÉS | [2021/20] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 01.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/20] | 27.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2010195607 (LEE IN HO [KR], et al); | [Y]WO2014087556 (NEC CORP [JP]); | International search | [A]US2017005913 (HAMPEL KARL GEORG [US], et al); | [A]US2017006499 (HAMPEL KARL GEORG [US], et al); | by applicant | US2010195607 | WO2014087556 |