EP3822122 - DRIVING SUPPORT METHOD AND A DRIVING SUPPORT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2 Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | For all designated states Renault s.a.s 122-122 bis avenue du Général Leclerc 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [2022/30] |
Former [2022/09] | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2 Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | ||
For all designated states Renault s.a.s 13/15, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | |||
Former [2021/20] | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2 Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | ||
For all designated states RENAULT s.a.s. 13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJITA, Susumu c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD., Intellectual Property Department 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243--0123 / JP | 02 /
TAKAMATSU, Yoshiro c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD., Intellectual Property Department 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | [2021/20] | Representative(s) | Global IP Europe Patentanwaltskanzlei Pfarrstraße 14 80538 München / DE | [2021/20] | Application number, filing date | 18925907.0 | 12.07.2018 | [2021/20] | WO2018IB00964 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020012212 | Date: | 16.01.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3822122 | Date: | 19.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q1/38, B60Q1/34, G01C21/34 | [2021/27] | CPC: |
B60Q1/346 (EP,RU);
B60Q1/34 (KR,RU);
B60W30/10 (RU,US);
B60R16/02 (KR,RU);
B60W50/12 (RU,US);
H04W4/46 (RU,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/20] | B60Q1/38 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/20] | Title | German: | FAHRUNTERSTÜTZUNGSVERFAHREN UND FAHRUNTERSTÜTZUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2021/20] | English: | DRIVING SUPPORT METHOD AND A DRIVING SUPPORT DEVICE | [2021/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'AIDE À LA CONDUITE | [2021/20] | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.2021 | Translation filed | 10.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 10.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 10.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/20] | 01.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.05.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/40] | 07.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1580529 (HARMAN BECKER AUTOMOTIVE SYS [DE]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0017] , [0 42] - [0044]; figures 1-6 *; | [A]DE102006041433 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0029] - [0032]; figures 1-9; claims 1-5 *; | [A]EP1895274 (AGERE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-9* paragraphs [0009] , [0 20]; figures 1, 2 *; | [A]FR2913930 (CADO JEAN-PIERRE [FR]) [A] 1-9 * figures 1-5; claims 1-11 *; | [A]JP2009115530 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102009047436 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-9 * figures 1-3; claims 1-11 *; | [XI]JP2016138866 (TOYOTA MAPMASTER INC) [X] 1-3,9 * the whole document * [I] 4-8; | [A]JP2017109657 (VALEO JAPAN CO LTD) [A] 1-9 * figures 1-30; claims 1,2 * | International search | [Y]JPH0636193 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP, et al) [Y] 5-8 * , *; | [Y]JP2007017266 (DENSO CORP) [Y] 5-8* , *; | [Y]JP2008087711 (AISIN AW CO) [Y] 4-8 * , *; | [Y]JP2016138866 (TOYOTA MAPMASTER INC) [Y] 1-9 * , *; | [Y]JP2017109657 (VALEO JAPAN CO LTD) [Y] 1-9 * , *; | [Y]JP2017111498 (DENSO CORP) [Y] 1-9 * , * | by applicant | JP2001336944 |