EP3820709 - METHOD FOR CONDUCTING A REFILL PROCESS AND PRINTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/20] | UNATTENDED RESERVOIR REFILLINGS | ||
[2024/04] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 10300 Energy Drive Spring TX 77389 / US | [2021/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
O'HARA, Steve A. Columbia Tech Center 1115 SE 164th Ave. Vancouver, Washington 98683 / US | 02 /
WONG, Howard G. Columbia Tech Center 1115 SE 164th Ave. Vancouver, Washington 98683 / US | 03 /
SCHALK, Wesley R. Columbia Tech Center 1115 SE 164th Ave. Vancouver, Washington 98683 / US | 04 /
KOLODZIEJ, Roger J. 1070 NE Circle Blvd. Corvallis, Oregon 97330 / US | 05 /
ARNOLD, Christopher J. Columbia Tech Center 1115 SE 164th Ave. Vancouver, Washington 98683 / US | 06 /
HAN, Ki Jung Columbia Tech Center 1115 SE 164th Ave. Vancouver, Washington 98683 / US | 07 /
COLLIE, Lynn A. Columbia Tech Center 1115 SE 164th Ave. Vancouver, Washington 98683 / US | [2021/20] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2024/14] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2021/20] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 18926296.7 | 13.07.2018 | [2021/20] | WO2018US41980 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020013846 | Date: | 16.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3820709 | Date: | 19.05.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3820709 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 16.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/175, B67D7/34, B41J29/13 | [2022/08] | CPC: |
B41J2/17509 (EP,US);
B41J2/1752 (EP);
B41J2/17523 (EP,US);
B41J2/1755 (EP,US);
B41J29/13 (EP);
B67D7/34 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/20] | B41J2/175, B67D7/34 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG EINES NACHFÜLLPROZESSES UND DRUCKVORRICHTUNG | [2024/04] | English: | METHOD FOR CONDUCTING A REFILL PROCESS AND PRINTING DEVICE | [2024/04] | French: | MÉTHODE POUR EFFECTUER UN PROCESSUS DE RECHARGE ET DISPOSITIF D'IMPRESSION | [2024/04] |
Former [2021/20] | UNBEAUFSICHTIGTE BEHÄLTERNACHFÜLLUNG | ||
Former [2021/20] | UNATTENDED RESERVOIR REFILLINGS | ||
Former [2021/20] | REMPLISSAGES DE RÉSERVOIR AUTOMATIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 22.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/20] | 15.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0863016 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1-3,7-10,13 * column 1 - column 2 * * column 7; figures 1-3 * [I] 4-6,11,12,14,15; | [X]US2001019346 (PAWLOWSKI NORMAN E JR [US], et al) [X] 1,7,13 * paragraphs [0002] - [0098]; figure 1 *; | [A]WO2017036487 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO LP [US], et al) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]WO2017060275 (SICPA HOLDING SA [CH]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2017190565 (PROPER SCOTT T [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] - [0016] - [0 33] - [0050]; figure 1 *; | [X]US2017225479 (HIRASAWA YUSUKE [JP]) [X] 1,7,13 * paragraphs [0008] - [0060]; figures 1, 2 * | International search | [X]US2001019346 (PAWLOWSKI NORMAN E JR [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * , [0064], [0067], [0115], [0133], [0158], [0159], fig. 1A, 15, 44, abstract *; | [A]US2005157095 (SILVERBROOK KIA [AU], et al) [A] 1-15; | [A]US2016075142 (KOMPLIN STEVEN R [US])[A] 1-15 | by applicant | EP0863016 | US2001019346 |