EP3826429 - HEAT-COOKING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2021/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INOSHITA, Chizuru c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2021/21] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2021/21] | Application number, filing date | 18927214.9 | 18.07.2018 | [2021/21] | WO2018JP26923 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020016965 | Date: | 23.01.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3826429 | Date: | 26.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3826429 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H05B6/12 | [2021/21] | CPC: |
H05B6/1218 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOCHVORRICHTUNG | [2021/21] | English: | HEAT-COOKING DEVICE | [2021/21] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CUISSON À LA CHALEUR | [2021/21] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2021 | Translation filed | 12.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 12.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/21] | 19.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 03.04.2024 | [2024/44] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2004073355 (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al) [A] 1-15* figure 1 *; | [A]WO2008042805 (BOSE CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 1 *; | [A]KR20150029046 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * figure 1 * | International search | [Y]JPH06123428 (RINNAI KK) [Y] 10-12, 14-20 * , fig. 2 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2001336757 (RINNAI KK) [Y] 10-12, 14-20 * , fig. 2 (Family: none) *; | [XY]JP2003077627 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [X] 1, 4-5, 9, 13 * , paragraphs [0021]-[0034], fig. 1, 5 (Family: none) * [Y] 2-3, 6-8, 10- 12, 14-20; | [Y]JP2003234168 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 3, 7-8, 10-12, 14-20 * , paragraph [0040], fig. 10 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2003234167 (HITACHI HOME TEC LTD) [Y] 14-20 * , paragraphs [0047], [0049], fig. 5 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2004039375 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [Y] 2-3, 7-8, 11- 12, 14-20 * , paragraphs [0009]-[0017], fig. 1-3 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2005063747 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 7-8, 10-12, 14- 20 * , paragraphs [0016], [0017], [0030], fig. 1 & CN 2745472 Y *; | [Y]JP2005123054 (HITACHI HOME TEC LTD) [Y] 2-3, 6-8, 10- 12, 14-20 * , paragraphs [0025]-[0058], fig. 1-3 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2015041495 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP, et al) [Y] 15-20* , paragraphs [0042]-[0051] (Family: none) *; | [Y]US2018128493 (CHEN JIE [US], et al) [Y] 10-12, 14-20 * , fig. 3 (Family: none) * | by applicant | JP2003257601 | JP2005123054 |